EP1232456 - DISTRIBUTING AND BILLING SOFTWARE ACCORDING TO CUSTOMER USE OF PROGRAM MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invensys Systems, Inc. 33 Commercial Street Foxboro, MA 02035-2099 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Invensys Systems, Inc. 33 Commercial Street Foxboro, MA 02035-2099 / AU | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Wonderware Corporation 100 Technology Drive Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOWELL, Timothy, Charles 26561 Rancho Parkway South Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [2002/41] |
Former [2002/34] | 01 /
SOWELL, Timothy, Charles 2814 Lafayette Avenue Newport Beach, CA 92663 / US | Representative(s) | Friese, Martin Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Friese, Martin Patentanwälte Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/34] | Prins, Adrianus Willem Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00970809.0 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000US28155 | Priority number, date | US19990418943 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 418943 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129728 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232456 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06F21/105 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q50/184 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2135 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF DIE KUNDENVERWENDUNG VON PROGRAMMMODULEN BASIERENDE SOFTWAREVERTEILUNG UND SOFTWAREABRECHNUNG | [2002/34] | English: | DISTRIBUTING AND BILLING SOFTWARE ACCORDING TO CUSTOMER USE OF PROGRAM MODULES | [2002/34] | French: | DISTRIBUTION ET FACTURATION DE LOGICIEL EN FONCTION DE L'UTILISATION DE MODULES DE PROGRAMMES PAR LE CLIENT | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.03.2012 | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/29] | 08.03.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 09.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE DE GB | Date: | 17.11.2005 | [2006/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0332304 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-73 * abstract *; | [X]US5023907 (JOHNSON HERRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1-73 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9311480 (INTERGRAPH CORP [US]) [X] 1-73 * abstract * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 32 * * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 3 *; | [X]US5905860 (OLSEN JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-73 * abstract * * column 4, line 12 - line 37 * * column 5, line 6 - column 8, line 41 * * column 11, line 37 - column 12, line 30 * * column 15, line 3 - line 47 * * column 16, line 5 - line 30 *; | [X]US5940504 (GRISWOLD GARY N [US]) [X] 1-73 * abstract *; | [A]WO9858306 (TECHWAVE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-73 * abstract * | [A] - "TRACKING CONCURRENT USAGE LICENSE PRODUCTS INSTALLED ON CLIENT'S MACHINE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19940801), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0018-8689, page 345, XP000456446 [A] 1-73 * the whole document * | [A] - "COUNTING USERS OF AN OPERATING SYSTEM", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19950301), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 579 - 581, XP000508145 [A] 1-73 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5940504 (GRISWOLD GARY N [US]); | [A]US5745879 (WYMAN ROBERT M [US]); | [A]US5930357 (FUKUI TOSHIYUKI [JP]); | [A]US5935243 (HASEBE TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [AP]US6049789 (FRISON MICHAEL R [US], et al); | [AP]US6073124 (KRISHNAN GANAPATHY [US], et al) |