EP1222302 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING, METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS OF CHOLESTEROL LOWERING AGENTS FROM HIGHER BASIDIOMYCETES MUSHROOMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medmyco, Ltd. Hahistadrut Avenue 99, P.O. Box 25321 32150 Haifa / IL | For all designated states Wasser, Solomon P. Ore 7/15 34731 Haifa / US | For all designated states Reshetnikov, Sergey V. G. Deurpa, 65/26 Kiev, 252214 / UA | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASSER, Solomon, P. Rechov Hashikma 19/80 Nesher, 36812 / IL | 02 /
RESHETNIKOV, Sergey V. G. Deurpa, 65/26 Kiev, 252214 / UA | [2002/43] |
Former [2002/29] | 01 /
WASSER, Solomon, P. Ore 7/15 34731 Haifa / IL | ||
02 /
RESHETNIKOV, Sergey V. G. Deurpa, 65/26 Kiev, 252214 / UA | Representative(s) | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 00970841.3 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US28234 | Priority number, date | US19990419205 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 419205 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0127305 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222302 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12P1/02, C12N1/14 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
C12P1/02 (EP,US);
A61K36/07 (EP,US);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHOLESTERINSENKENDEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS HÖHEREN BASIDIOMYCETEN, UND DAZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2002/29] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING, METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS OF CHOLESTEROL LOWERING AGENTS FROM HIGHER BASIDIOMYCETES MUSHROOMS | [2002/29] | French: | PROCESSUS DE PRODUCTION D'HYPOCHOLESTEROLEMIANTS A PARTIR DE CHAMPIGNONS BASIDIOMYCETES SUPERIEURS, PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS CORRESPONDANTS | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 25.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/46] | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - PANI R. K. ET AL, "Effect of carbon and nitrogen nutrition on the growth of some edible Basidiomycetes in submerged culture", J. PHYTOL. RES., (1997), vol. 10, no. 1-2, pages 63 - 64, XP001117643 [Y] 1-6 * see page 63, right column * | [Y] - LEE JONG YEON ET AL, "Drying temperature can change the specific surface area of Phanerochaete chrysosporium pellets for copper adsorption.", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (199806), vol. 20, no. 6, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 531 - 533, XP002216981 [Y] 1-6 * see abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005357924548 | [A] - EL-KATTAN M H ET AL, "SUBMERGED PRODUCTION OF THE EDIBLE FUNGI PLEUROTUS-SAJOR-CAJU AT DIFFERENT PH LEVELS", ZENTRALBLATT FUER MIKROBIOLOGIE, (1988), vol. 143, no. 8, ISSN 0232-4393, pages 631 - 635, XP002216982 | [A] - BURLA G ET AL, "EFFECTS OF DIFFERENT GROWTH CONDITIONS ON ENZYME PRODUCTION BY PLEUROTUS-OSTREATUS IN SUBMERGED CULTURE", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 42, no. 2, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 89 - 94, XP002216983 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-8524(92)90066-7 | International search | [Y]US4369253 (TAKITA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [X] - JONG ET AL., Filamentous fungi, ATCC CATALOG, (1996), XP002937162 [X] * 19th Edition, entry #90212; page 424 * | [X] - BOBEK P. ET AL., "Effects of oyster mushroom (Pleurotus ostreatus) and its ethanolic extract in diet on absorption and turnover of cholesterol in hypercholesterolemic rat", NAHRUNG, (199608), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 222 - 224, XP002937163 | [X] - GUNDE-CIMERMAN N. ET AL., "Pleurotus fungi produce mevinolin, an inhibitor of HMG CoA reductase", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (1993), vol. 113, pages 333 - 337, XP002937164 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1097(93)90227-S |