EP1244411 - PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS HAVING REDUCED LEAKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALEY, Michael, Allen 5865 Haterleigh Drive Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | 02 /
ACHTER, Bruce, Wilfuhr 12315 Clairmonte Avenue Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | 03 /
COLMAN, Charles, Wilson 2611 Shadow Woods Circle Marietta, GA 30062 / US | 04 /
DIPALMA, Joseph 451 East Peckham Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 05 /
JACKSON, David, Martin 9825 Summer Oaks Drive Roswell, GA 30076 / US | 06 /
KOLLIN, Nancy, Donaldson 315 Woodchuck Court Roswell, GA 30076 / US | 07 /
LATIMER, Margaret, Gwyn 115 Jones Bridge Woods Place Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | 08 /
LEFKOWITZ, Gregory, Marc 11075 Glenbarr Drive Duluth, Georgia 30097 / US | 09 /
LITTLE, Sylvia, Bandy 3051 Intrepid Close Marietta, GA 30062 / US | 10 /
MATELA, David, Michael 1280 Mayfield Manor Drive Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | 11 /
POTTS, David, Charles 5268 Wynterhall Court Dunwoody, GA 30338 / US | 12 /
SAWYER, Lawrence, Howell 117 Ashbrooke Place Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 13 /
GOERG-WOOD, Kristin, Ann N7830 Niagara Court Sherwood, WI 54169 / US | [2002/45] |
Former [2002/40] | 01 /
DALEY, Michael, Allen 5865 Haterleigh Drive Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | ||
02 /
ACHTER, Bruce, Wilfuhr 12315 Clairmonte Avenue Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | |||
03 /
COLMAN, Charles, Wilson 2611 Shadow Woods Circle Marietta, GA 30062 / US | |||
04 /
DIPALMA, Joseph 451 East Peckham Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | |||
05 /
JACKSON, David, Martin 9825 Summer Oaks Drive Roswell, GA 30076 / US | |||
06 /
KOLLIN, Nancy, Donaldson 315 Woodchuck Court Roswell, GA 30076 / US | |||
07 /
LATIMER, Margaret, Gwyn 115 Jones Bridge Woods Place Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | |||
08 /
LEFKOWITZ, Gregory, Marc 5110 Spring Creek Lane Atlanta, GA 30350 / US | |||
09 /
LITTLE, Sylvia, Bandy 3051 Intrepid Close Marietta, GA 30062 / US | |||
10 /
MATELA, David, Michael 4025 Lullwater Way Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | |||
11 /
POTTS, David, Charles 5268 Wynterhall Court Dunwoody, GA 30338 / US | |||
12 /
SAWYER, Lawrence, Howell 117 Ashbrooke Place Neenah, WI 54956 / US | |||
13 /
GOERG-WOOD, Kristin, Ann N7830 Niagara Court Sherwood, WI 54169 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00970885.0 | 13.10.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000US28391 | Priority number, date | US19990159352P | 14.10.1999 Original published format: US 159352 P | US20000653389 | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 653389 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0126596 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1244411 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/534 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
A61F13/4702 (EP,US);
A61F13/15203 (EP,US);
A61F13/534 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEPRODUKTE MIT REDUZIERTEM AUSLAUFEN | [2002/40] | English: | PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS HAVING REDUCED LEAKAGE | [2002/40] | French: | PRODUITS DE SOINS PERSONNELS PRESENTANT UNE FUITE MOINS IMPORTANTE | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/08] | 02.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9851250 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [XD] 1-9 * page 17, line 1 - page 42, line 25 * * figures 1-17 *; | [X]US5910137 (CLARK TRACEY A [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 5, line 52 - column 7, line 65 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]US5820973 (DODGE RICHARD NORRIS II [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7 * column 5, line 25 - column 15, line 56 * * example 1 *; | [A]WO9948454 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 9 - line 22 * * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 22 * * examples 1,2 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0523683 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 47 - page 8, line 21 * * tables 1-3 *; | [A]EP0494112 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON [CA]) [A] 1 * examples 1-3; tables 1-4 *; | [A]US5364382 (LATIMER MARGARET G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, line 60 - column 37, line 11 * * column 14, line 27 - line 49 * * figures 1-16 *; | [A]US5855572 (SCHMIDT MATTIAS [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 39 - line 67 * * column 6, line 46 - column 10, line 65 *; | [A]US5401267 (COUTURE-DORSCHNER LAURIE [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 * |