EP1225934 - BOLUS TIP DESIGN FOR A MULTI-LUMEN CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. Bard, Inc. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states C.R. Bard Inc. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | ||
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Bard Access Systems, Inc., a subsidiary of C.R. Bard, Inc. 5425 West Amelia Earhart Drive Salt Lake City, UT 84116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECANT, Leonard, J., Jr. 105 Lyndhurst Circle Wexford, PA 15090 / US | 02 /
BELUSKO, Vincent, J. 555 W. Fifth Street, Suite 3500 Los Angeles, CA 90013 / US | 03 /
DIFIORE, Attilio, E. 1601 W. Cannonwood Place Taylorsville, UT 84123 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2002/51] | 01 /
DECANT, Leonard, J., Jr. 105 Lyndhurst Circle Wexford, PA 15090 / US | ||
02 /
BELUSKO, Vincent, J. 555 W. Fifty Street, Suite 3500 Los Angeles, CA 90013 / US | |||
03 /
DIFIORE, Attilio, E. 1601 W. Cannonwood Place Taylorsville, UT 84123 / US | |||
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
DECANT, Leonard, J., Jr. 105 Lyndhurst Circle Wexford, PA 15090 / US | ||
02 /
BELUSKO, Vincent, J. 801 South Figueroa Street Los Angeles, CA 90017-5554 / US | |||
03 /
DIFIORE, Attilio, E. 1601 W. Cannonwood Place Taylorsville, UT 84123 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00971024.5 | 27.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US29522 | Priority number, date | US19990429857 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: US 429857 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0132240 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1225934 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225934 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
A61M25/0069 (EP,US);
A61M1/3653 (EP,US);
A61M1/3659 (EP,US);
A61M1/3661 (EP,US);
A61M25/0023 (EP,US);
A61M25/0032 (EP,US);
A61M25/0068 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0031 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0034 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0037 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOLUSSPITZENGESTALTUNG FÜR EINEN MEHRLUMIGEN KATHETER | [2002/31] | English: | BOLUS TIP DESIGN FOR A MULTI-LUMEN CATHETER | [2002/31] | French: | MODELE D'EMBOUT A BOLUS DESTINE A UN CATHETER MULTILUMIERE | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 29.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.05.2007 | BE | 09.05.2007 | CH | 09.05.2007 | CY | 09.05.2007 | DK | 09.05.2007 | FI | 09.05.2007 | LI | 09.05.2007 | NL | 09.05.2007 | GR | 10.08.2007 | ES | 20.08.2007 | PT | 09.10.2007 | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 20.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]US1696018 (BOTO SCHELLBERG OSCAR); | [X]US5571093 (CRUZ COSME [US], et al); | [Y]US5797869 (MARTIN GEOFFREY S [CA], et al) |