EP1226315 - MODULAR DRAINAGE CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE, ES, GB, IE, IT, NL | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Urriola, Humberto 48 Willawee Road Castle Cove, NSW 2068 / AU | [2002/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00971126.8 | 18.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000AU01261 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ03490 | 18.10.1999 Original published format: AU PQ349099 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129334 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226315 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226315 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E03F1/00, E02B11/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
E03F1/005 (EP,US);
E02B11/005 (EP,US);
Y02A10/30 (EP,US);
Y02A20/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | E03F5/10, E03F1/00, E03F5/14, E03F3/00, E03F3/04, E02B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE ENTWÄSSERUNGSRINNEN | [2002/31] | English: | MODULAR DRAINAGE CHANNELS | [2002/31] | French: | CANAUX DE DRAINAGE MODULAIRES | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 16.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Polypipe Civils Limited Charnwood Business Park North Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 1LE / GB Opponent's representative Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles, et al, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | 02
05.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG Hellinger Str. 1 97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Markus Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Polypipe Civils Limited Charnwood Business Park North Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 1LE / GB Opponent's representative Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles, et al, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
02
05.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG Hellinger Str. 1 97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Markus Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Polypipe Civils Limited Charnwood Business Park North Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 1LE / GB Opponent's representative Johnson, Terence Leslie, et al, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
02
05.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG Hellinger Str. 1 97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Markus Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Polypipe Civils Limited Charnwood Business Park North Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 1LE / GB Opponent's representative Johnson, Terence Leslie, et al, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
02
05.09.2008
19.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG Hellinger Str. 1 97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Markus Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
Polypipe Civils Limited Charnwood Business Park North Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 1LE / GB Opponent's representative Johnson, Terence Leslie, et al, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
02
05.09.2008
Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG Hellinger Str. 1 97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE | |||
Former [2008/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
Polypipe Civils Limited Charnwood Business Park North Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 1LE / GB Opponent's representative Johnson, Terence Leslie, et al, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | 13.10.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.05.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.05.2009 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2009 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2011 | 09.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/27] | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2007 | BE | 05.12.2007 | CH | 05.12.2007 | CY | 05.12.2007 | DK | 05.12.2007 | FI | 05.12.2007 | LI | 05.12.2007 | SE | 05.03.2008 | PT | 05.05.2008 | LU | 18.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | GB | 18.10.2010 | IE | 18.10.2010 | IT | 18.10.2010 | ES | 19.10.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | NL | 01.05.2011 | DE | 02.05.2011 | GR | 03.05.2011 | [2013/31] |
Former [2011/35] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
LU | 18.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
LU | 18.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9516833 (URRIOLA HUMBERTO [AU]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 5 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 5 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * figures 2-10; claim - *; | [A]US5848856 (BOHNHOFF WILLIAM WALTER [US]) [A] 5* figures 2,5 *; | [A]US5954451 (PRESBY DAVID W [US]) [A] 3,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0943737 (WAVIN BV [NL]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract *; | [PX]WO0050142 (URRIOLA HUMBERTO [AU], et al) [PX] 1-3,5 * figures 2,9,10,12,13,20-22,24,26; claim 11 * * page 21, line 9 - page 22, line 2 * * page 30, line 3 - line 14 * | International search | [A]FR2410496 (HYDRO SYSTEM SRL [IT]); | [A]DE4321350 (ROTHFUSS THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]WO9516833 (URRIOLA HUMBERTO [AU]); | [X]EP0768432 (BOISSIE CHANTAL [FR], et al); | [XP]EP0952257 (BORGHI AZIO S P A [IT], et al); | [A]GB2338021 (BALLAST NEDAM GROND & WEGEN B [NL]); | [X]AU728958B (NEW CLEAR WATER PTY LTD) |