EP1254412 - DATA MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lechwerke AG Schaezlerstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [2003/40] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states LEW Lech-Elektrizitätswerke AG Schaetzlerstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POOST, Kurt Lew Lech-Elektrizitätswerke AG, Schaezlerstrasse 3 86150 Ausburg / DE | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/45] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00971369.4 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/45] | WO2000EP10059 | Priority number, date | DE1999151756 | 27.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19951756 | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0131498 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254412 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254412 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
G06F16/252 (EP);
G06F16/21 (EP);
G06F16/958 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENVERWALTUNG | [2002/45] | English: | DATA MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2002/45] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA GESTION DE DONNEES | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.10.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 16.02.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Request for further processing for: | 26.10.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | IE | 02.03.2005 | IT | 02.03.2005 | NL | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | AT | 12.10.2005 | CY | 12.10.2005 | BE | 31.10.2005 | CH | 31.10.2005 | LI | 31.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/35] | ES | 02.03.2005 | |
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
IT | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
AT | 12.10.2005 | ||
CY | 12.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/23] | ES | 02.03.2005 | |
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
AT | 12.10.2005 | ||
CY | 12.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | ES | 02.03.2005 | |
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
CY | 12.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | ES | 02.03.2005 | |
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | ES | 02.03.2005 | |
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
IE | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0458720 (IBM [US]) [A] 8,9,15-17* the whole document *; | [X]US5835712 (DUFRESNE FRED B [US]) [X] 1-22 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 15 * * column 9, line 19 - column 10, line 32 * * column 13, line 50 - column 16, line 14 * * figures 7-11A,12A-14 *; | [A] - REINHART G ET AL, "INTEGRATION VON ZULIEFERERN IN DAS DATEN- UND PROZESSMANAGEMENT INTEGRATION OF SUPPLIERS INTO THE DATA AND PROCESS MANAGEMENT", ZWF ZEITSCHRIFT FUR WIRTSCHAFTLICHE FERTIGUNG UND AUTOMATISIERUNG, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19960901), vol. 91, no. 9, ISSN 0947-0085, pages 391 - 394, XP000640066 [A] 1,4-7,10,11,13,14,18-20,22 * the whole document * | [A] - HUTCHINSON G ET AL, "Implementation of dynamic web database interface using cold fusion", ACM SIGUCCS. USER SERVICES CONFERENCE 98. BRANCHING OUT, SIGUCCS '98. USER SERVICES CONFERENCE FOR COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY COMPUTING SERVICES ORGANIZATIONS, BLOOMINGTON, IN, USA, 25-28 OCT. 1998, 1998, New York, NY, USA, ACM, USA, ISBN 1-58113-006-6, pages 131 - 135, XP002196494 [A] 1-7,10-14,18-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/288335.288482 |