EP1222250 - MUTANT LACTIC BACTERIA WITH A CAPACITY FOR OVEREXPRESSING AT LEAST ONE PEPTIDASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE (INRA) 147, rue de l'Université 75338 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [2007/24] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE (INRA) 147, rue de l'Université 75338 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUEDON, Eric 63 rue Diaz 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
ANBA-MONDOLONI, Jamila 13, rue Charles Linné F-78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | 03 /
DELORME, Christine 15, résidence des Basses Garennes F-91120 Palaiseau / FR | 04 /
RENAULT, Pierre 9, rue Magellan F-78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/29] | 01 /
GUEDON, Eric 26, rue Jules Ferry F-92100 Boulogne / FR | ||
02 /
ANBA-MONDOLONI, Jamila 13, rue Charles Linné F-78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | |||
03 /
DELORME, Christine 15, résidence des Basses Garennes F-91120 Palaiseau / FR | |||
04 /
RENAULT, Pierre 9, rue Magellan F-78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | Representative(s) | Breesé, Pierre Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Breese, Pierre Breese - Majerowicz - Simonnot 3, avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00971462.7 | 13.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000FR02869 | Priority number, date | FR19990012924 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9912924 | [2002/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0129183 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1222250 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222250 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12Q1/68 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
C12N9/52 (EP,US);
C07K14/315 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/29] | C12N1/20, C12Q1/68, A23C19/032, // C12R1:46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUTANTEN VON MILCHSÄUREBAKTERIEN DIE MINDESTENS EINE PEPTIDASE ÜBEREXPRIMEREN | [2002/29] | English: | MUTANT LACTIC BACTERIA WITH A CAPACITY FOR OVEREXPRESSING AT LEAST ONE PEPTIDASE | [2002/29] | French: | BACTERIES LACTIQUES MUTANTES CAPABLES DE SUREXPRIMER AU MOINS UNE PEPTIDASE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 10.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | GB | 13.06.2007 | IE | 13.06.2007 | IT | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | DE | 14.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | LU | 13.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | FR | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A] - KUNJI EDMUND R S ET AL, "Transport of beta-Casein-derived Peptides by the Oligopeptide Transport System Is a Crucial Step in the Proteolytic Pathway of Lactococcus lactis.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1569 - 1574, XP002141676 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.4.1569 | [DA] - MARUGG JOEY D ET AL, "Medium-dependent regulation of proteinase gene expression in Lactococcus lactis: Control of transcription initiation by specific dipeptides.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 177, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 2982 - 2989, XP002141677 [DA] * the whole document * | [A] - FISHER SUSAN H ET AL, "Role of CodY in regulation of the Bacillus subtilis hut operon.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 178, no. 13, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 3779 - 3784, XP002160377 [A] 7-9 * the whole document * | [A] - FISHER SUSAN H, "Regulation of nitrogen metabolism in Bacillus subtilis: Vive la difference!", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199904), Database accession no. PREV199900269050, XP002160389 [A] 7-9 * abstract * | [ ] - MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (199904), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 223 - 232 | [DA] - KUNJI E ET AL, "The proteolytic systems of lactic acid bacteria", ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, (1996), vol. 70, pages 187 - 221, XP000914826 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00395933 |