EP1228054 - COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS CYSTEINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCKER, Howard Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
LARGE, Michael Stewart Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 03 /
OLDFIELD, John Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 04 /
JOHNSTONE, Craig Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 05 /
EDWARDS, Philip, Neil Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [2002/32] | Application number, filing date | 00971559.0 | 23.10.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000GB04086 | Priority number, date | GB19990025264 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9925264 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0130772 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228054 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/185, C07D295/192, A61K31/5375, A61P19/10 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
C07D295/185 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P33/08 (EP);
A61P33/12 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS INHIBITOREN VON CYSTEIN-PROTEASEN | [2002/32] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS CYSTEINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS | [2002/32] | French: | COMPOSES ET UTILISATION DE CES COMPOSES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEASE A CYSTEINE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 05.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9924460 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - line 19 * * page 14, structures V, V' V'' * * examples 1-10 * * claims 9,10 *; | [A]EP0498665 (BRITISH BIO TECHNOLOGY [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 40 *; | [A]WO9819998 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 18 * |