EP1226314 - APPARATUS FOR STORMWATER RETENTION AND RELEASE, AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bryant Group Plc Cranmore House, Cranmore Boulevard Solihull West Midlands B90 4SD / GB | [2006/36] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Bryant Group Plc Cranmore House, Cranmore Boulevard Solihul, West Midlands B90 4SD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COURIER, Stuart Francis 5 Ainsdale Gardens Halesowen West Midlands B63 1HW / GB | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Stonehouse, Sidney William Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Stonehouse, Sidney William Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00971567.3 | 25.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000GB04097 | Priority number, date | GB19990025384 | 27.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9925384 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0131129 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226314 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226314 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E03F1/00, E03F5/10 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
E03F5/101 (EP,US);
E03F5/106 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6969 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86228 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86356 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | 18.05.2002 | LT | 18.05.2002 | LV | 18.05.2002 | MK | 18.05.2002 | RO | 18.05.2002 | SI | 18.05.2002 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZURÜCKHALTUNG BZW. ABGABE VON REGENWASSER UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2002/31] | English: | APPARATUS FOR STORMWATER RETENTION AND RELEASE, AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | [2002/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENTION ET DE LIBERATION D'EAU PLUVIALE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 10.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2006 | BE | 06.09.2006 | CH | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | FR | 06.09.2006 | IT | 06.09.2006 | LI | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | IE | 25.10.2006 | LU | 25.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | DE | 07.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | ES | 17.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
FR | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
LU | 25.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
LU | 25.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
LI | 06.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4285812 (STOLTZ RICHARD J) [A] 18,19 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0565483 (NILL WERNER [CH]) [A] 10,11,16,17 * page 3, line 14 - page 3, line 21; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US5342144 (MCCARTHY EDWARD J [US]) [Y] 1-9,12-15,18,21-32 * column 8, line 21 - column 8, line 34; figures 3-6 *; | [Y]DE29611700U (FISCHER HEIKO [DE]) [Y] 1-9,12-15,18,21-32 * page 9, line 15 - page 9, line 22; figure 4 *; | [Y]EP0825304 (VORTECHNICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-9,12-15,18,21-32 * column 7, line 6 - column 7, line 24; figures 11,11A *; | [A]WO9820209 (WAVIN BV [NL], et al) [A] 15* the whole document * |