EP1225918 - CONJUGATES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYNCH, Joseph, E. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
ROBBINS, Michael, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
SHI, Yao-Jun 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
LIEBERMAN, David, R. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00972259.6 | 18.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US28799 | Priority number, date | US19990160361P | 19.10.1999 Original published format: US 160361 P | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0128593 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225918 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
A61K47/65 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONJUGATEN VERWENDBAR BEI PROSTATA-KREBS | [2002/31] | English: | CONJUGATES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER | [2002/31] | French: | PROCESSUS DE PREPARATION DE CONJUGUES CONVENANT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 09.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9818493 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-44 * examples 3,4; claims 14-17,24-26 *; | [E]WO0130804 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [E] 1-44 * page 2 * * page 6; examples 3,4; claim 18 *; | [E]WO0129065 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [E] 1-44 * page 20 *; | [PX]WO0059930 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-44 * page 128 - page 130; examples 26,44 * * page 472 - page 473 * |