EP1223980 - USE OF CSF-1 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state ???moredetails.lapse.edited??? CH, LI | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofbauer, Reinhold Karl-Lothringer-Strasse 81/36 1210 Wien / AT | For all designated states Aharinejad, Seyedhossein Meytensgasse 33/2 1130 Wien / AT | [2003/05] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Hofbauer, Reinhold Karl-Lothringer-Strasse 81/36 1210 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHARINEJAD, Seyedhossein Meytensgasse 33/2 A-1130 Wien / AT | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Alge, Daniel, et al SONN Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Alge, Daniel, Mag. Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Köhler-Pavlik Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 00972422.0 | 25.10.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000AT00281 | Priority number, date | AT19990001813 | 28.10.1999 Original published format: AT 181399 | [2002/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0130381 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1223980 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1223980 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61K48/00 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
C12N15/1136 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CSF-1-INHIBITOREN | [2002/30] | English: | USE OF CSF-1 INHIBITORS | [2002/30] | French: | UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS CSF-1 | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 09.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2004
23.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608-2917 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 02
20.02.2004
03.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. 51, University Street Seattle, WA 98101 / US Opponent's representative von Menges, Albrecht Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2004
23.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608-2917 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
20.02.2004
03.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. 51, University Street Seattle, WA 98101 / US Opponent's representative von Menges, Albrecht Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2004/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2004
Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
20.02.2004
03.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. 51, University Street Seattle, WA 98101 / US Opponent's representative von Menges, Albrecht Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 29.03.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.12.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.08.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.03.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/33] | Appeal following opposition | 01.10.2007 | Appeal received No. T1721/07 | 30.11.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.03.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 29.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 21.05.2003 | LI | 21.05.2003 | [2012/49] |
Former [2011/32] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/34] | IT | 25.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X] - HARAN-GHERA NECHAMA ET AL, "Increased circulating colony-stimulating factor-1 (CSF-1) in SJL/J mice with radiation-induced acute myeloid leukemia (AML) is associated with autocrine regulation of AML cells by CSF-1.", BLOOD, (1997), vol. 89, no. 7, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2537 - 2545, XP002165343 [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * | [X] - KESHAVA N ET AL, "Blocking of colony stimulating factor expression with antisense RNA in breast and ovarian cancer epithelial cells leads to programmed cell death.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, Eighty-eighth Annual Meeting of the American Association for Cancer Research;San Diego, California, USA; April 12-16, 1997, 1997, (1997), vol. 38, ISSN 0197-016X, page 500, XP002165344 [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [X] - MENETRIER-CAUX C G MONTMAIN ET AL, "Inhibition of the differentiation of dendritic cells from cD34+ progenitors by tumor cells: Role of interleukin-6 and macrophage colony-stimulating factor.", BLOOD, (19981215), vol. 92, no. 12, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4778 - 4791, XP002165345 [X] 1,2 * abstract * |