EP1332585 - METHOD FOR GROUPING AND TRANSMITTING MULTIMEDIA DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swisscom AG Ostermundigenstrasse 93 3000 Bern 29 / CH | [2003/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEDERMANN, Daniel Einschlag CH-3128 Rümligen / CH | 02 /
BEN YACOUB, Souheil Postfach CH-3050 Bern / CH | 03 /
HERRMANN, Beat Klaraweg 37 CH-3006 Bern / CH | 04 /
SCHLAUSS, Denis Blankweg 7 CH-3072 Ostermundigen / CH | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 00972522.7 | 09.11.2000 | [2003/32] | WO2000CH00597 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0241579 | Date: | 23.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332585 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332585 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L65/60 (US);
G06F16/22 (EP,US);
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
G06F16/483 (US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N21/232 (US);
H04N21/251 (US);
H04N21/25891 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AGGREGATION UND ZUM ÜBERMITTELN VON MULTIMEDIADATEN | [2003/32] | English: | METHOD FOR GROUPING AND TRANSMITTING MULTIMEDIA DATA | [2003/32] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A RASSEMBLER ET A TRANSMETTRE DES DONNEES MULTIMEDIA | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 24.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.03.2005 | IE | 09.03.2005 | TR | 09.03.2005 | DK | 09.06.2005 | GR | 09.06.2005 | SE | 09.06.2005 | ES | 20.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | CY | 09.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
IE | 09.03.2005 | ||
TR | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
ES | 20.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CY | 09.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
IE | 09.03.2005 | ||
TR | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
ES | 20.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
IE | 09.03.2005 | ||
TR | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
ES | 20.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
IE | 09.03.2005 | ||
TR | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
ES | 20.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
IE | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
ES | 20.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
IE | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
ES | 20.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
IE | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO9843177 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9,11-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 15 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 15 * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 25 * * page 14, line 15 - line 25 * * page 15, line 15 - page 16, line 6 * * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 6; claims 1-17 * [A] 10 [Y] 6,8; | [A]EP0905939 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 10 * * column 4, line 44 - column 53 * * column 6, line 20 - line 35 *; | [XY]US6049831 (GARDELL STEVEN E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 20 - line 30; figure 8 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 31 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 8 * * column 5, line 1 - line 9 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 20 * * column 8, line 40 - line 52 * [Y] 6,8; | [XA] - MOHAN RAKESH, SMITH JOHN R., LI CHUNG-SHENG, "Content Adaptation Framework: Bringing the Internet to Information Appliances", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, GLOBECOM 99, vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-5796-5, (19991205), pages 2015 - 2021, URL: http://www.ieee.org, (20010502), XP002166338 [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1999.827560 |