EP1212782 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT WITH AT LEAST A CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/24] | INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT WITH AT LEAST A CAPACITOR AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE SAID | ||
[2006/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUMANN, Dirk Theresienstrasse 13 01097 Dresden / DE | 02 /
SELL, Bernhard Priessnitzstrasse 41 01099 Dresden / DE | 03 /
WILLER, Josef Friedrich-Fröbel-Strasse 62 85521 Riemerling / DE | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Kottmann, Heinz Dieter, et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Kottmann, Heinz Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00972582.1 | 06.09.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000DE03123 | Priority number, date | DE1999142680 | 07.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942680 | [2002/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0118849 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1212782 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212782 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H01L28/91 (EP,US);
H10B12/00 (KR);
H10B12/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM KONDENSATOR | [2006/32] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT WITH AT LEAST A CAPACITOR | [2006/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN ENSEMBLE CIRCUIT INTEGRE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN CONDENSATEUR | [2006/32] |
Former [2002/24] | INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM KONDENSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2002/24] | INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT WITH AT LEAST A CAPACITOR AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE SAID | ||
Former [2002/24] | ENSEMBLE CIRCUIT INTEGRE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN CONDENSATEUR, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.01.2007 | GB | 24.01.2007 | IE | 24.01.2007 | IT | 24.01.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 24.01.2007 | |
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 14.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | GB | 24.01.2007 | |
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | IE | 24.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0917971 ; | [A]EP0386947 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]); | [A]US5124766 (CLARK DAVID R [US]); | [X]US5604148 (LUR WATER [TW]); | [X]DE19720202 (UNITED MICROELECTRONICS CORP [TW]); | [X]US5763305 (CHAO FANG-CHING [TW]) | Examination | US5394000 |