EP1226313 - LIQUID DELIVERY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeyes Group Limited Brunel Way Thetford Norfolk IP24 1HF / GB | [2008/23] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Jeyes Group Limited Brunel Way Thetford Norfolk IP24 1HF / GB | ||
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Slade, Brian 20 Star Road Ashford, Kent TN24 8BX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slade, Brian, Parry 20 Star Road Ashford, Kent TN24 8BX / GB | [2008/23] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00973048.2 | 02.11.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000GB04236 | Priority number, date | EP19990308706 | 02.11.1999 Original published format: EP 99308706 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0132995 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226313 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226313 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/03 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
E03D9/032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSABGABEVORRICHTUNGEN | [2002/31] | English: | LIQUID DELIVERY DEVICES | [2002/31] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2008 | CY | 04.06.2008 | DK | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | SE | 04.09.2008 | IE | 02.11.2008 | LU | 02.11.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.11.2008 | ||
LU | 02.11.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.11.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2839763 (NEWSOM WILLIAM G) [X] 1,23 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 19; figure - * [A] 12,18,19,21; | [DA]EP0538957 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [DA] 12,18,19* the whole document *; | [XA]US5271560 (DE WINTER KOEN [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,23 * column 5, line 10 - line 14 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 10; figures 8,11,12 * [A] 12,18-21; | [DA]EP0669137 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [DA] 1,2,4,8,9,11-13,15-20 * column 4, line 19 - line 28; figure 2 *; | [DA]EP0785315 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [DA] 12,18,19 * the whole document *; | [XA]FR2747139 (ROBERTET [FR]) [X] 1,21,23 * page 2, line 86 - page 3, line 113; figure 2 * [A] 12,18,19 |