EP1227779 - NEEDLE SAFE TRANSFER GUARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325-1219 / US | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAFABASH, Jason, H. 1702 South Armacost Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 00973819.6 | 24.10.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000US29328 | Priority number, date | US19990434648 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: US 434648 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134089 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227779 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227779 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/20 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2013 (EP,US);
A61J1/2051 (EP,US);
A61J1/2055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT SICHEREM NADELSCHUTZ | [2002/32] | English: | NEEDLE SAFE TRANSFER GUARD | [2002/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE TRANSFERT POUR UNE AIGUILLE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 19.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | BE | 10.03.2004 | CH | 10.03.2004 | CY | 10.03.2004 | FI | 10.03.2004 | IT | 10.03.2004 | LI | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | LU | 24.10.2004 | IE | 26.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
IT | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
LU | 24.10.2004 | ||
IE | 26.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
LU | 24.10.2004 | ||
IE | 26.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
IE | 26.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2160668 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1-3,5,9,14,15,18,20 * the whole document *; | [XA]US3993063 (LARRABEE EDWARD W) [X] 1,5,10,11,18 * the whole document *[A] 2; | [X]FR2560049 (ERBA FARMITALIA [IT]) [X] 1,2,5,10,11,18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US19990428818 |