EP1234307 - PRECESSED RECORDING FOR REWRITABLE DISK MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIS, Donald, Henry 5175 East 74th Place Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Thies, Stephan Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Thies, Stephan Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 00973835.2 | 25.10.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000US29376 | Priority number, date | US19990434187 | 04.11.1999 Original published format: US 434187 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0133570 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1234307 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234307 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B20/10 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
G11B20/1217 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/036 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10898 (KR);
G11B2020/10962 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1238 (KR);
G11B2220/216 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHOBENE AUFZEICHNUNG FÜR WIEDERBESCHREIBBARES PLATTEMEDIUM | [2002/35] | English: | PRECESSED RECORDING FOR REWRITABLE DISK MEDIUM | [2002/35] | French: | ENREGISTREMENT A PRECESSION POUR DISQUE REINSCRIPTIBLE | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 29.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63229625 ; | [X]EP0469727 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,10 * figure 11 * * column 15, line 19 - line 43 *; | [XAY]WO9730439 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10 * figure 4 * * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 28 * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 13 * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 20 * [A] 4,5,8,9 [Y] 2,3,11,12; | [X]EP0892395 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,12 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 51 * * column 5, line 13 - line 29 *; | [Y]EP0942420 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 2,3,11,12 * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890125), vol. 013, no. 032, Database accession no. (P - 817), & JP63229625 A 19880926 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,6,10 * abstract * |