EP1232620 - VARIABLE RATE SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2002/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOSH, Amitava 3240 Indian Creek Drive Buffalo grove, IL 60089 / US | 02 /
CLASSON, Brian, K. 756 W.Bloomfield Ct. Palatine, IL 60067 / US | 03 /
CUDAK, Mark, C. 3318 Chestnut Drive McHenry, IL 60050 / US | 04 /
JALLOUL, Louay 1501 Churchill Drive 104 Palatine, IL 60067 / US | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/40] | 01 /
GHOSH, Amitava 3240 Indian Creek Drive Buffalo grove, IL 60089 / US | ||
02 /
CLASSON, Brian, K. 124 Red Cedar Drive Streamwood, IL 60107 / US | |||
03 /
CUDAK, Mark, C. 3318 Chestnut Drive McHenry, IL 60050 / US | |||
04 /
JALLOUL, Louay 1501 Churchill Drive 104 Palatine, IL 60067 / US | |||
Former [2002/34] | 01 /
GHOSH, Amitava 289 Hunter Court Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | ||
02 /
CLASSON, Brian, K. 124 Red Cedar Drive Streamwood, IL 60107 / US | |||
03 /
CUDAK, Mark, C. 3318 Chestnut Drive McHenry, IL 60050 / US | |||
04 /
JALLOUL, Louay 1501 Churchill Drive 104 Palatine, IL 60067 / US | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm, et al Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm, et al Openshaw & Co. Town Hall Exchange The Town Hall Buildings Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7ND / GB | ||
Former [2002/34] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00973870.9 | 26.10.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000US29474 | Priority number, date | US19990442367 | 17.11.1999 Original published format: US 442367 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0137506 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232620 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232620 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/30, H04B7/26, H04Q7/38 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04L1/0059 (EP,US);
H04J13/10 (KR);
H04B1/7097 (KR);
H04B7/264 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70703 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/34] | H04L27/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SPREIZSPEKTRUMVERMITTLUNGSVERFAHREN VERÄNDERLICHER GESCHWINDIGKEIT, SOWIE EINRICHTUNG | [2002/34] | English: | VARIABLE RATE SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2002/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION A SPECTRE ETALE A VITESSE VARIABLE | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5781542 (TANAKA HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 17 - line 63 * * column 4, line 63 - column 7, line 12 *; | [A]EP0944201 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-10* figures 2-4 * | International search | [A]US5781542 (TANAKA HIROKAZU [JP], et al); | [A]US5909469 (FRODIGH CARL MAGNUS [SE], et al) |