EP1232215 - THERMALLY STABLE POLYESTER MOLDING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Martin Diedesfelder Strasse 26 67487 Maikammer / DE | 02 /
HECKMANN, Walter Geiersbergstrasse 2 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2002/34] | Application number, filing date | 00974513.4 | 10.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000EP11101 | Priority number, date | DE1999156539 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19956539 | [2002/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138436 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232215 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08L69/00 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L25/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCH STABILE POLYESTERFORMMASSEN | [2002/34] | English: | THERMALLY STABLE POLYESTER MOLDING MATERIALS | [2002/34] | French: | MATIERES MOULABLES POLYESTERIQUES THERMOSTABLES | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0269984 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * page 7, line 52 - page 8, line 14; claim - *; | [A]US4629760 (LIU PING Y [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 15 - line 29; claims 1,6 *; | [A]WO9214787 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * page 28, line 19 - line 30; claims 1,2,10,20,21 *; | [A]US5412028 (YEO JONG K [KR], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 7; example 8; claim 1 * |