EP1228295 - PROTECTIVE SCREEN ARRANGEMENT FOR AN AGRICULTURAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Belgium N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2003/01] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESNIJDER, Dirk, J. Schaapherderstraat 13/B B-9032 Wondelgem / BE | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Ameye, Dirk Cyriel André, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3 A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Ameye, Dirk Cyriel André, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3 A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [2002/32] | Ameye, Dirk Cyriel André New Holland Belgium N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3 A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 00974534.0 | 10.11.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000EP11248 | Priority number, date | GB19990026771 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: GB 9926771 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0136794 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228295 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228295 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01P11/12, B60K11/08 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
B60K11/02 (EP,US);
F01P11/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHIRMANORDNUNG FÜR EINE LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE MASCHINE | [2002/32] | English: | PROTECTIVE SCREEN ARRANGEMENT FOR AN AGRICULTURAL MACHINE | [2002/32] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECRAN DE PROTECTION POUR MACHINE AGRICOLE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | BE | 15.09.2004 | CH | 15.09.2004 | CY | 15.09.2004 | ES | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | TR | 15.09.2004 | IE | 10.11.2004 | LU | 10.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IT | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
LU | 10.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
LU | 10.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2561709 (OWATONNA MFG CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4889382 (BURST HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,8 * figure - *; | [A]DE19547348 (FORTSCHRITT ERNTEMASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5676197 (DIEBOLD DAVID HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1,4-7 * abstract * |