EP1225982 - SPRAYING DEVICE AND USE THEREOF IN A BACTERICIDAL TREATMENT TUNNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen K. / DK | [2006/31] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states DANISCO FRANCE 20, rue Brunel 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Rhod P 26 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Rhodia Food 40, rue de la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 26, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92512 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERICI, Ernest Le Petit Camp F-40180 Yzosse / FR | 02 /
BONNOT, Dominique 12, rue de la Mare F-78380 Bougival / FR | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2002/31] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00974652.0 | 03.11.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000FR03073 | Priority number, date | FR19990013922 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9913922 | [2002/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0132315 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1225982 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225982 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/16, A23B4/30, B05B7/04 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B05B7/0416 (EP);
A23B4/30 (EP);
B05B7/164 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DEREN ANWENDUNG IN EINER TUNNELFÖRMIGEN BEHANDLUNGSKAMMER ZUR BAKTERIZIDEN BEHANDLUNG | [2002/31] | English: | SPRAYING DEVICE AND USE THEREOF IN A BACTERICIDAL TREATMENT TUNNEL | [2002/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PULVERISATION ET SON APPLICATION A UN TUNNEL DE TRAITEMENT BACTERICIDE | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2006 | CY | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | IE | 05.04.2006 | TR | 05.04.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | CH | 30.11.2006 | LI | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 05.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2041001 (KNOWLTON DANICL E) [A] 2,7 * page 1, column R, line 33 - line 41 *; | [A]US3960523 (RYAN JAMES R) [A] 3,4 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 1 *; | [X]WO9010503 (MITAB PRODUCTS AB [SE]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 21 *; | [A]US5723184 (YAMAMOTO CHRISTOPHER W [US]) [A] 5,6 * column 4, line 18 ** column 4, line 36 - line 37; figure 4 *; | [X]US5775122 (WAASE DIETER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 12 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [X]US5860598 (CRUZ LUIS R [AR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 17; figure 2 * |