EP1222257 - USE OF NERNSTEIN VOLTAGE SENSITIVE DYES IN MEASURING TRANSMEMBRANE VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caliper Life Sciences, Inc. 605 Fairchild Drive Mountain View, CA 94043-2234 / US | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Caliper Life Sciences, Inc. 605 Fairchild Road Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Caliper Life Science, Inc. 605 Fairchild Road Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Caliper Technologies Corporation 650 Fairchild Drive Mountain View, CA 94043-2234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARINAS, Javier, Anibal 1664 Kensington Avenue Los Altos, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
WADA, H., Garrett 55 Victoria Drive Atherton, CA 94027 / US | [2002/46] |
Former [2002/29] | 01 /
FARINAS, Javier, Anibal 75 Coronado Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | ||
02 /
WADA, H., Garrett 55 Victoria Drive Atherton, CA 94027 / US | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00975224.7 | 06.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US27659 | Priority number, date | US19990158323P | 08.10.1999 Original published format: US 158323 P | US19990168792P | 02.12.1999 Original published format: US 168792 P | US20000229951P | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 229951 P | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0127253 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222257 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N13/00, C12Q1/02, G01N1/30, G01N15/06 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
G01N31/22 (EP,US);
G01N1/30 (EP,US);
G01N33/5005 (EP,US);
G01N2001/302 (EP,US);
G01N2458/00 (EP,US);
Y10S435/968 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON NERNSTPOTENZIAL-EMPFINDLICHEN FARBSTOFFEN BEI DER MESSUNG VON TRANSMEMBRANPOTENZIALEN | [2002/29] | English: | USE OF NERNSTEIN VOLTAGE SENSITIVE DYES IN MEASURING TRANSMEMBRANE VOLTAGE | [2002/29] | French: | UTILISATION DE TEINTURES SENSIBLES AU POTENTIEL DE NERNST POUR MESURER LE POTENTIEL TRANSMEMBRANAIRE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 12.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/04] | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9850577 (CHEMOMETEC AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 21, lines 16-30 * * pages 58,60 * * claims 33-36 *; | [A]WO9931232 (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6 * page 40, lines 16-31 * * pages 82-84; examples 12,13 ** pages 85-87 * | International search | [A]US4741898 (MALLIK ARJUN [US], et al); | [Y]US4762799 (SEITZ WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [A]US5124141 (MAKLER MICHAEL T [US]); | [Y]US5239998 (KRAUTHAMER VICTOR [US]); | [Y]US5661035 (TSIEN ROGER Y [US], et al); | [Y]US5874668 (XU SHAOHUA [US], et al); | [AP]US5995871 (KNISLEY STEPHEN B [US]); | [YP]US6107066 (TSIEN ROGER Y [US], et al) |