EP1229855 - INHALATOR FOR TREATMENT OF BRONCHIAL DISORDER IN HORSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nielsen, Helle Funch Lejlighed 79, Vandtarnsvej 7 3460 Birkerod / DK | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Kyed, Iver, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Kyed, Iver, et al Hofman-Bang Zacco A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 00975835.0 | 15.11.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000DK00633 | Priority number, date | DK19990001644 | 16.11.1999 Original published format: DK 164499 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0135856 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229855 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1229855 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61D7/04, A61M15/00 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
A61D7/04 (EP,US);
A61M15/0015 (EP,US);
A61M15/0016 (EP,US);
A61M15/0018 (EP,US);
A61M15/0086 (EP,US);
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M2250/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALATOR ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER BRONCHIEN VON PFERDEN | [2002/33] | English: | INHALATOR FOR TREATMENT OF BRONCHIAL DISORDER IN HORSES | [2002/33] | French: | INHALATEUR POUR TRAITER DES TROUBLES BRONCHIQUES CHEZ LES CHEVAUX | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 18.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2003 | FI | 04.06.2003 | TR | 04.06.2003 | GR | 04.09.2003 | PT | 04.09.2003 | CY | 15.11.2003 | LU | 15.11.2003 | IE | 17.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/03] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
CY | 15.11.2003 | ||
LU | 15.11.2003 | ||
IE | 17.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
CY | 15.11.2003 | ||
LU | 15.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
CY | 15.11.2003 | ||
LU | 15.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
CY | 15.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 04.09.2003 | |
PT | 04.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2111838 (FEIERABEND GEORG); | [A]EP0444905 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]EP0537991 (MONAGHAN CANADIAN LTD [CA]); | [X]US5385140 (SMITH COLLIN M [AU]); | [A]US5755221 (BISGAARD HANS [DK]) |