EP1222055 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TESTING THE CUTTING EDGE GEOMETRY OF A ROTARY-DRIVEN TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blum-Novotest GmbH Kaufstrasse 14 88287 Grünkraut / DE | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHER, Heribert Hofkammerstrasse 13 88069 Tettnang / DE | 02 /
RIEDTER, Bruno Martinusweg 6 88250 Weingarten / DE | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Goetz, Rupert Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00975886.3 | 19.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000EP10313 | Priority number, date | DE1999150331 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19950331 | [2002/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128737 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222055 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222055 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q17/09, B23Q17/22, B23Q17/24, G01V8/12, G01B11/00 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
G05B19/00 (EP,US);
B23Q17/0909 (EP,US);
B23Q17/2485 (EP,US);
G01B11/14 (EP,US);
G05B19/401 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36276 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37227 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37228 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37233 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37256 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37415 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49145 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50133 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/32] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÜFEN EINER SCHNEIDENGEOMETRIE EINES DREHANTREIBBAREN WERKZEUGS | [2002/29] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TESTING THE CUTTING EDGE GEOMETRY OF A ROTARY-DRIVEN TOOL | [2002/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TESTER LA GEOMETRIE DU TRANCHANT D'UN OUTIL POUVANT ETRE ENTRAINE EN ROTATION | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03017891.7 / EP1400309 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02212045 ; | [Y]US3817647 (LEMELSON J) [Y] 1-4,12-17,19,22-26,28 * column 13, line 30 - column 14, line 42; figure 5 *; | [Y]US3900738 (MCKAY SR RUSSELL M) [Y] 1-4,12-17,19,22-26,28 * the whole document *; | [A]US4667113 (NAKAJIMA KIYOHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-28* abstract *; | [Y]DE19720176 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-4,12-17,19,22-26,28 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901108), vol. 014, no. 510, Database accession no. (M - 1045), & JP02212045 A 19900823 (DISCO ABRASIVE SYST LTD) [A] 1-28 * abstract * |