EP1227794 - METHOD FOR ENCAPSULATING PROTEINS OR PEPTIDES IN LIPOSOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/32] | METHOD FOR ENCAPSULATING PROTEINS OR PEPTIDES IN LIPOSOMES, LIPOSOMES PRODUCED USING SAID METHOD, AND THEIR USE | ||
[2005/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novosom GmbH Weinbergweg 22 06120 Halle / DE | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANZNER, Steffen Blumenstrasse 9 06108 Halle / DE | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 DE-10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Ziebig, Marlene, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00976017.4 | 09.11.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000EP11079 | Priority number, date | DE1999154843 | 09.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19954843 | [2002/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0134115 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227794 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227794 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
A61K9/1277 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERKAPSELUNG VON PROTEINEN ODER PEPTIDEN IN LIPOSOMEN | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD FOR ENCAPSULATING PROTEINS OR PEPTIDES IN LIPOSOMES | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENCAPSULAGE DE PROTEINES OU DE PEPTIDES DANS DES LIPOSOMES | [2005/24] |
Former [2002/32] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERKAPSELUNG VON PROTEINEN ODER PEPTIDEN IN LIPOSOMEN, MIT DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE LIPOSOMEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2002/32] | METHOD FOR ENCAPSULATING PROTEINS OR PEPTIDES IN LIPOSOMES, LIPOSOMES PRODUCED USING SAID METHOD, AND THEIR USE | ||
Former [2002/32] | PROCEDE D'ENCAPSULAGE DE PROTEINES OU DE PEPTIDES DANS DES LIPOSOMES, ET LIPOSOMES REALISES SELON LEDIT PROCEDE ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 22.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | IE | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5782310 ; | [A]US4933121 (LAW SAY-JONG [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 26, Database accession no. 1982-53654e, XP002167845 & JPS5782310 A 00000000 (TANABE SEIYAKU) [X] 1-3,10,13,14,16-19 * abstract * | Examination | US4342826 |