EP1242337 - TEMPERATURE STABILISATION OF DIELECTRIC RESONATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOUTH BANK UNIVERSITY ENTERPRISES LTD. 103 Borough Road London SE1 0AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states South Bank University Enterprises Ltd. 103 Borough Road London SE1 0AA / GB | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states SOUTH BANK UNIVERSITY ENTERPRISES LIMITED 103 Borough Road London SE1 0AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALFORD, Neil McNeil Flat 3, 33 Compayne Gardens London NW6 3DD / GB | 02 /
PENN, Stuart James 34 Maitland Road Wickford, Essex SS12 9PU / GB | 03 /
BREEZE, Jonathan Flat 5, Terrance House 45 Bredgar Road, Archway London N19 5BH / GB | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Milhench, Mark Lorne First Thought IP Ltd The Ramblers Gents Lane, Shimpling Bury St. Edmunds, Suffolk IP29 4HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Milhench, Mark Lorne First Thought IP 35 New Broad Street House New Broad Street London EC2M 1NH / GB | ||
Former [2007/32] | Milhench, Mark Lorne First Thought IP Ltd 35 New Broad Street House New Broad Street London EC2M 1NH / GB | ||
Former [2002/39] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00976184.2 | 20.11.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000GB04399 | Priority number, date | GB19990028865 | 07.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9928865 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142167 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242337 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/87, H01P7/10 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5041 (EP,US);
C04B41/87 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00844 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (US,EP);
C04B41/5041, C04B41/46 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSTABILISIERUNG DIELEKTRISCHER RESONATOR | [2002/39] | English: | TEMPERATURE STABILISATION OF DIELECTRIC RESONATOR | [2002/39] | French: | STABILISATION EN TEMPERATURE D'UN RESONATEUR DIELECTRIQUE | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2008 | 30.11.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH026154 ; | [X]JPH0971418 ; | [A]JPH05174627 ; | [A]FR2738836 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [A] 13,14 * claims 1,6 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990316), vol. 014, no. 140, Database accession no. (M - 0950), & JP02006154 A 00000000 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - S.H. HYUN, ET AL., CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940711), vol. 121, no. 2, Database accession no. 15841r, page 434, XP000494158 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - YOOP HAKHOECHI, Korea, (1992), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 107 - 118 | [X] - C. S. HWANG, ET AL., CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900528), vol. 112, no. 22, Database accession no. 202503v, page 310, XP000153474 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - YOOP HAKHOECHI, Korea, (1989), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 539 - 549 | [X] - K. KATO, "Photocatalytic Property of TiO2 Anchored on Porous Alumina Ceramic Support by the Alkoxide Method.", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN - INTERNATIONAL EDITION, Tokyo, (199303), vol. 101, no. 3, pages 240 - 244, XP000381418 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 21, Database accession no. 1997-231057, XP002165371 & JPH0971418 A 00000000 (SAGAKEN) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 32, Database accession no. 1993-253904, XP002165372 & JPH05174627 A 00000000 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | US391672 | US562556 | US3798578 | US4580116 | US5356844 | US5909160 | - "HIGH FRENQUENCY CERAMIC DIELECTRICS AND THEIR APPLICATION FOR MICROWAVE COMPONENTS", Wersing, Ed BCH Steele Elsevier, pages 67-119 |