EP1150118 - CHOLESTEROL SENSOR AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CHOLESTEROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Motokazu 4-28-402, Amanogahara Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0034 / JP | 02 /
YUGAWA, Keiko 708-1-513, Gakuendaiwacho 6-chome Nara-shi, Nara 631-0041 / JP | 03 /
NANKAI, Shiro 4-50-12, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00976303.8 | 16.11.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000JP08100 | Priority number, date | JP19990331219 | 22.11.1999 Original published format: JP 33121999 | [2001/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138862 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1150118 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1150118 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, C12Q1/00, G01N33/92, G01N33/543, G01N27/30 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/60 (EP,US);
C12Q1/005 (EP,US);
G01N33/92 (EP,US);
G01N2800/044 (EP,US);
Y10S435/817 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/44] | G01N27/327, C12Q1/00, G01N33/92 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN VON CHOLESTERIN | [2001/44] | English: | CHOLESTEROL SENSOR AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CHOLESTEROL | [2001/44] | French: | DETECTEUR DE CHOLESTEROL ET METHODE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UN CHOLESTEROL | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2001 | Translation filed | 14.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0884392 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6,8 * example 1 * [A] 1-4,7; | [YA]EP0856586 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6,8 * column 3, lines 17-43 * [A] 1-4,7; | [Y]EP0627627 (MILES INC [US]) [Y] 5,6,8 * abstract * * page 4, lines 35-52 *; | [A]EP0913484 (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,7 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 56 *; | [A]US5286626 (LAW WAI T [US], et al) [A] 5,6,8 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 17 *; | [A]US5407836 (ZIEGENHORN JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 5,6,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0887422 (DENKA SEIKEN KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, lines 45-55 * | International search | [A]EP0794429 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0849589 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5814472 (MIKI YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [A]EP0764848 (KYOWA MEDEX CO LTD [JP]) |