EP1235069 - BIOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMINAMI, Takahiro 325, Sashimonocho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-0903 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Motokazu 4-28-402, Amanogaharacho Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0034 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Shin 2-5-16-205, Fujigao Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0022 / JP | 04 /
NANKAI, Shiro 4-50-12, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00976304.6 | 16.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000JP08101 | Priority number, date | JP19990326097 | 16.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32609799 | [2002/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0136955 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1235069 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1235069 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, C12Q1/00, G01N27/30, G01N33/543 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
C12Q1/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/35] | G01N27/327 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Title | German: | BIOSENSOR | [2002/35] | English: | BIOSENSOR | [2002/35] | French: | BIODETECTEUR | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2002 | Translation filed | 13.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2006 | BE | 28.06.2006 | CH | 28.06.2006 | CY | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | LI | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | IE | 16.11.2006 | LU | 16.11.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
TR | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
IE | 16.11.2006 | ||
LU | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
IE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
IE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
IE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10227755 ; | [Y]EP0328380 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-14 * page 3, lines 10-32 *; | [XY]EP0368474 (MEDISENSE INC [US]) [X] 1-5,15-17 * column 2, line 15 - column 6, line 25 * [Y] 6-8; | [Y]US5082786 (NAKAMOTO SHINYA [JP]) [Y] 6-14 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0795601 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 12-14 * column 8, lines 22-28; example 1 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10227755 A 19980825 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 9-11 * abstract * | [A] - T. J. MOORE ET AL, "Enzymatically amplified voltammetric sensor for microliter sample volumes of salicylate", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 67, pages 1896 - 1902, XP002220896 [A] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00107a022 | International search | [Y]JPS57120853 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS6468650 (SEITAI KINO RYO KAGAKUHIN); | [Y]JPH06138080 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |