EP1272019 - PRINTED-CIRCUIT BOARD, MULTILAYER PRINTED-CIRCUIT BOARD AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-0917 / JP | [2007/22] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-0917 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENOMOTO, Ryo Techn.Research Group, R&D Operation IBIDEN C O.,LTD. 1, Kitagata 1-chome, Ibigwa-cho Ib i-gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 02 /
TAMAKI, Masanori Techn.Research Group, R&DOperation IBIDEN CO.,LTD; 1,Kitagata 1-chome Ibigawa-cho Ibi-gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00976306.1 | 16.11.2000 | [2003/01] | WO2000JP08103 | Priority number, date | JP20000035406 | 14.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000035406 | [2003/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160136 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272019 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272019 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/46 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H05K3/4617 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09563 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0733 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1189 (EP,US);
H05K3/328 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE, MEHRSCHICHTIGE LEITERPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/01] | English: | PRINTED-CIRCUIT BOARD, MULTILAYER PRINTED-CIRCUIT BOARD AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2003/01] | French: | CARTE IMPRIMEE, CARTE IMPRIMEE MULTICOUCHE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2002 | Translation filed | 22.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 23.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | GB | 16.11.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/09] | FI | 30.05.2007 | |
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 30.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3953924 (ZACHRY CLYDE L, et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]EP0793405 (CTS CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9839781 (ORMET CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US5873161 (CHEN YU [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * example 1 *; | [A]US5948533 (GALLAGHER CATHERINE A [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH11186730 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [X]US5939789 (KAWAI MICHIFUMI [JP], et al) |