EP1246630 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING SKIN GROWTH AND MANAGING SKIN CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marantech Holding, LLC Suite 810, One Turk's Head Place Providence, RI 02903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Marantech Holding, LLC Suite 810, One Turk's Head Place Providence, RI 02903 / US | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Marantech Holding, LLC 187 North Brow Street East Providence, RI 02914 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTELMAN, Marvin, S. Skolnik Street 9/30, P.O. Box 382 Rehovot / IL | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2002/41] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 00976613.0 | 20.10.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000US29115 | Priority number, date | US20000174793P | 06.01.2000 Original published format: US 174793 P | US20000184053P | 22.02.2000 Original published format: US 184053 P | US20000552172 | 18.04.2000 Original published format: US 552172 | US20000214503P | 28.06.2000 Original published format: US 214503 P | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0149302 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1246630 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00, A61K33/24, A61K33/26, A61K33/34, A61K33/38 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
A61K8/0208 (EP);
A61K33/24 (EP,US);
A61K33/245 (EP);
A61K33/26 (EP);
A61K33/32 (EP);
A61K33/34 (EP);
A61K33/38 (EP);
A61K47/02 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/08 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/04 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61Q1/12 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
C01G3/02 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES HAUTWACHSTUMS UND BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTZUSTÄNDEN | [2002/41] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING SKIN GROWTH AND MANAGING SKIN CONDITIONS | [2002/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DESTINES A FACILITER LA CROISSANCE DE LA PEAU ET A GERER DES AFFECTIONS CUTANEES | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.04.2003 | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2004 | 31.10.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2004 | 31.10.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2006 | 31.10.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5336499 (ANTELMAN MARVIN S [IL]); | [X]WO9745133 (ANTELMAN TECHNOLOGIES LTD [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * claim - * | International search | [X]US3923982 (LAMAND MICHEL, et al); | [X]US5571520 (ANTELMAN MARVIN S [IL]); | JP2000060976 [ ] (KOYANAGI HIROAKI); | [XP] - JPAB, XP002939643 |