EP1224276 - TRANSGENIC ANIMAL PRODUCTION USING LOPU-DERIVED OOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexia Biotechnologies, Inc. 1000 Avenue St. Charles, Bloc B Vaudreuil-Dorion Quebec J7V 8P5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Nexia Biotechnologies, Inc. 1000 Avenue St. Charles, Bloc B Vaudreuil-Dorion, Quebec J7V 8P5 / CA | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Nexia Biotechnologies, Inc. 21,025 Trans-Canada Highway Sainte Anne de Bellevue, Quebec H9X 3R2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDASSARRE, Hernan 14 Van Every Kirkland, Quebec City H9J 2P5 / CA | 02 /
Keefer, Carol L. 475 Boulevard Perrot No. 202 Ile Perrot, Quebec City J7V 3H4 / CA | 03 /
WANG, Bin 18191 Elkas Boulevard Kirkland, Quebec City H9J 3E1 / CA | 04 /
KARATZAS, Costas, N. 251 Sherwood Beaconsfield, Quebec H9W 2H4 / CA | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00976673.4 | 27.10.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000US29751 | Priority number, date | US19990162530P | 29.10.1999 Original published format: US 162530 P | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0132855 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224276 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, A01K67/027, C12N15/09, C12N15/63 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/873 (EP);
C12N2510/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/63, C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON TRANSGENEN TIEREN MITTELS DURCH LOPU ERHALTENDE OOCYTEN | [2002/30] | English: | TRANSGENIC ANIMAL PRODUCTION USING LOPU-DERIVED OOCYTES | [2002/30] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ANIMAUX TRANSGENIQUES UTILISANT DES OVOCYTES OBTENUS PAR PRELEVEMENT LAPAROSCOPIQUE (LOPU) | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 16.03.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5907080 (KARATZAS COSTAS [CA], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 30 * * column 2, line 27 * * column 6, line 65 * * column 7, line 26 *; | [Y]US5895833 (BERG RICHARD A [US]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * column 8, line 50 - line 63 * * column 9, line 45 - line 54 *; | [A]US5693534 (ALAK BAHA M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y] - KUBISCH ET AL, "Expression of two transgenes in in vitro matured and fertlized bovine zygotes after DNA microinjection", JOURNAL OF REPRODUCTION FERTIITY, (1995), vol. 104, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 133 - 139, XP009023803 [Y] 1,4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/jrf.0.1040133 | [Y] - POWELL D.J. AND AL., "The fate of DNA injected into mammalina oocytes and zygotes at different stages of the cell cycle", J. REPROD. FERTILITY, (1992), vol. 95, pages 211 - 220, XP009023899 [Y] 1-11 * page 29, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/jrf.0.0950211 | [Y] - BALDASSARRE H. ET AL., "Technique for efficient recovery of sheep oocytes by laparoscopic folliculocentesis", ANIMAL REPRODUCTION SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 35, pages 145 - 150, XP009023873 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4320(94)90014-0 | [A] - EBERT K.M., "The use of transgenic animals in biotechnology", INT. J. DEV. BIOL., (1998), vol. 42, pages 1003 - 1008, XP009023892 [A] 1-11 * page 1, column L, line 5 - line 6 * | International search | [Y]US5693534 ; | [YP]US6110741 ; | [Y]US5907080 ; | [Y]US5366888 ; | [Y]US5895833 |