EP1234202 - ARRANGEMENT OF OPTICAL FIBRE ELEMENTS AND A SPLICING BOX FOR OPTICAL FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKT Cables GmbH Schanzenstrasse 24 51063 Köln / DE | [2002/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMERPOHL, Uwe Bachstrasse 20 51467 Berg.-Gladbach / DE | 02 /
NIELSEN, Ole, Kjaer Spurvevej 5 DK-3100 Hornbaek / DK | 03 /
NORDLANDER, Uffe Svanevej 24B DK-2400 NV Kopenhagen / DK | 04 /
ZUMDICK, Heinrich Rondorfer Strasse 40 50354 Hürth / DE | [2002/35] | Application number, filing date | 00977459.7 | 02.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000EP10787 | Priority number, date | DE1999157405 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19957405 | [2002/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140840 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1234202 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
G02B6/44465 (EP);
G02B6/44775 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG VON LICHTWELLENLEITERELEMENTEN UND SPLEISSGEHÄUSEN FÜR LICHTWELLENLEITERELEMENTE | [2002/35] | English: | ARRANGEMENT OF OPTICAL FIBRE ELEMENTS AND A SPLICING BOX FOR OPTICAL FIBRES | [2002/35] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ELEMENTS A FIBRES OPTIQUES ET BOITIERS D'EPISSURE POUR ELEMENTS A FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 03.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4841103 (OESTREICH ULRICH [DE], et al); | [AD]DE4012183 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME ENERGIE [DE]); | [A]EP0646817 (ALCATEL KABEL NORGE AS [NO]); | [A]DE29800885U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]); | [E]WO0067058 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) |