EP1237487 - ULTRASONIC MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milo, Simcha Noga Street 6a 34407 Haifa / IL | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00977801.0 | 04.12.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000IB01785 | Priority number, date | US19990169226P | 06.12.1999 Original published format: US 169226 P | US20000190839P | 20.03.2000 Original published format: US 190839 P | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0141655 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1237487 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
A61M1/3627 (EP,US);
A61B17/22012 (EP,US);
A61M1/363 (EP,US);
B01D19/0078 (EP,US);
B01D19/0084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22009 (EP,US);
A61B8/481 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES ULTRASCHALLGERÄT | [2002/37] | English: | ULTRASONIC MEDICAL DEVICE | [2002/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL A ULTRASONS | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 24.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/11] | 31.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2003 | 31.12.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2008 | 31.12.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5334136 (SCHWARZ KARL [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 22-34 * * column 3, lines 16-23; figure 1 *; | [A]US5811658 (VAN DRIEL MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1* column 2, lines 16-65; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US5811658 (VAN DRIEL MICHAEL R [US], et al); | [Y]US5879314 (PETERSON THOMAS M [US], et al) |