EP1156531 - METHOD FOR RECLAIMING A DELAMINATED WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/47] | METHOD FOR RECYCLED SEPARATED WAFER AND RECYCLED SEPARATED WAFER | ||
[2014/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Soitec Parc Technologique des Fontaines Chemin des Franques 38190 Bernin / FR | [2014/42] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Soitec Parc Technologique des Fontaines Chemin des Franques 38190 Bernin / FR | |||
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states S.O.I.Tec Silicon on Insulator Technologies Parc Technologique des Fontaines, Chemin des Franques 38190 Bernin / FR | |||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
For all designated states S.O.I.Tec Silicon on Insulator Technologies Parc Technologique des Fontaines, Chemin des Franques 38190 Bernin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwabara, Susumu@Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 02 /
Mitani, Kiyoshi@Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 03 /
Tate, Naoto@Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 04 /
Nakano, Masatake@Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 05 /
Barge, [email protected] Silicon on Insulator Tech Parc Technologique des Fontaines 38190 Bernin / FR | 06 /
Maleville, Christophe@SOITEC Silicon on Ins. Tech Parc Technologique des Fontaines 38190 Bernin / FR | [2014/42] |
Former [2001/47] | 01 /
Kuwabara, Susumu Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | ||
02 /
Mitani, Kiyoshi Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | |||
03 /
Tate, Naoto Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | |||
04 /
Nakano, Masatake Isobe R & D Center Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | |||
05 /
Barge, Thierry S.O.I.TEC Silicon on Insulator Tech Parc Technologique des Fontaines 38190 Bernin / FR | |||
06 /
Maleville, Christophe SOITEC Silicon on Ins. Tech Parc Technologique des Fontaines 38190 Bernin / FR | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2001/47] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Ltd., 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00977956.2 | 27.11.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000JP08344 | Priority number, date | JP19990338137 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: JP 33813799 | [2001/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0141218 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1156531 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156531 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/762, // H01L21/66, H01L21/02 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
H01L21/02032 (EP,US);
H01L27/12 (KR);
H01L21/76254 (EP,US);
H01L21/84 (KR);
H01L22/34 (EP,US);
Y10S438/906 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | H01L21/762 | ||
Former IPC [2001/47] | H01L27/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG EINES ABGETRENNTEN WAFER | [2014/17] | English: | METHOD FOR RECLAIMING A DELAMINATED WAFER | [2014/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION D'UN SUBSTRAT DELAMINE | [2014/17] |
Former [2001/47] | WIEDERVERWERTUNG SEPARIERTER SCHEIBE UND WIEDERVERWERTBARE SEPARIERTE SCHEIBE | ||
Former [2001/47] | METHOD FOR RECYCLED SEPARATED WAFER AND RECYCLED SEPARATED WAFER | ||
Former [2001/47] | PROCEDE DE RECYCLAGE D'UNE PLAQUETTE SEPAREE ET PLAQUETTE SEPAREE RECYCLEE | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2001 | Translation filed | 10.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.01.2014 | 29.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 15.01.2015 | [2015/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11297583 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK, et al) [X] 1-5 * page 4, paragraph 19 - page 4, paragraph 24; figure 1 * * page 6, paragraph 42 - paragraph 48; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0843344 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JPH08339947 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract *; | [E]US6174222 (SATO TOMOMI [JP], et al) [E] 2,3 * abstract *; | [A]JPH05226305 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-5 | International search | [X]JPH11297583 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK, et al); | [Y]JPH0562951 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH11121310 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]EP0843344 (CANON KK [JP]) | by applicant | JPH05211128 |