EP1248692 - TUNABLE BORING BAR FOR SUPPRESSING VIBRATIONS AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | For all designated states Design & Manufacturing Solutions, Inc. 5410 Avenue Simone Lutz, FL 33549 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Kennametal Inc. P.O. Box 231, 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US | ||
For all designated states Design & Manufacturing Solutions, Inc. 5410 Avenue Simone Lutz, FL 33549 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETLING, Scott, A. 1008 High Meadow Court Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | 02 /
STERN, Elliot, L. 16203 Sierra de Avila Tampa FL 33613 / US | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/02] | 01 /
ETLING, Scott, A. 1008 High Meadow Court Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | ||
02 /
STERN, Elliot 16203 Sierra de Avila Tampa FL 33613 / US | |||
Former [2002/42] | 01 /
ETLING, Scott, A. 1008 High Meadow Court Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | ||
02 /
STERN, Elliot, L., Design & Manufact. Solut. Inc. 5410 Avenue Simone Lutz, FL 33549 / US | Representative(s) | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Sties, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00978410.9 | 06.11.2000 | [2002/42] | WO2000US30639 | Priority number, date | US20000488720 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: US 488720 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0153025 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1248692 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1248692 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/02 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
F16F7/104 (EP,US);
B23B29/022 (EP,US);
F16F15/10 (EP,US);
Y10T408/03 (EP,US);
Y10T408/76 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304312 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Title | German: | ABSTIMMBARE BOHRSTANGE ZUM UNTERDRÜCKEN VON SCHWINGUNGEN UND DESSEN METHODE | [2002/42] | English: | TUNABLE BORING BAR FOR SUPPRESSING VIBRATIONS AND METHOD THEREOF | [2002/42] | French: | BARRE D'ALESAGE ACCORDABLE POUR SUPPRESSION DES VIBRATIONS ET PROCEDE Y RELATIF | [2002/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 22.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | BE | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | CY | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | TR | 22.09.2004 | LU | 06.11.2004 | IE | 08.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | ES | 02.01.2005 | PT | 22.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
CY | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
LU | 06.11.2004 | ||
IE | 08.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 08.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 08.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2051954 (LELAND GEORGE H) [A] * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US3447402 (RAY JOSEPH C) [A] 1-4,8,11,12,18-22,28,29,33 * column 3, line 16 - line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [DXA]US3774730 (MADDUX K) [DX] 21-24,28,29,35,36 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 63; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-9,11,12,15; | [A]US3838936 (ROSDAL I, et al) [A] 1-3,8,14,20-22,28,29,36 * column 3, line 8 - line 26; figure 4 *; | [A]US4553884 (FITZGERALD GARY W [US], et al) [A] * figure 2 *; | [A]US5518347 (COBB JR WILLIAM T [US]) [A] * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5810528 (O'CONNOR TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] * figures 2,4 * |