EP1235634 - SOLUTION BASED TWO-DIMENSIONAL SEPARATION AND DETECTION OF AMPHOTERIC SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proteotools LLC 562 First Avenue South Suite 701 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | [2003/04] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Champagne, James T. 24241 Cockton Road S.W. Vashon, WA 98070 / US | ||
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Champagne, James T. Suite 300, 3005 First Avenue Seattle, WA 98121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Champagne, James T. 24241 Dockton Road S.W. Vashon, WA 98070 / US | [2003/04] |
Former [2002/36] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [2002/36] | Keller, Günter, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00978541.1 | 14.11.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000US31050 | Priority number, date | US19990165659P | 16.11.1999 Original published format: US 165659 P | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0136071 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1235634 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D57/02, B01D59/50, B01D61/58, G01N27/447, C07K1/28 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G01N30/461 (EP);
B01D57/02 (EP);
G01N27/44743 (EP);
G01N27/44769 (EP);
G01N30/02 (EP);
G01N30/463 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, G01N27/447 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/36] | B01D57/02, B01D59/50, B01D61/58 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ZWEIDIMENSIONALE TRENNUNG UND DETEKTION VON IN LÖSUNG BEFINDLICHEN AMPHOTEREN SUBSTANZEN | [2002/36] | English: | SOLUTION BASED TWO-DIMENSIONAL SEPARATION AND DETECTION OF AMPHOTERIC SUBSTANCES | [2002/36] | French: | SEPARATION ET DETECTION BIDIMENSIONNELLES EN SOLUTION DE SUBSTANCES AMPHOTERES | [2002/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 03.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/50] | Request for further processing for: | 20.11.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2006 | 30.11.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4243507 (MARTIN ARCHER J P, et al) [A] * column 1, lines 40-48 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 8 * * column 5, lines 3-40; figure - * | [A] - RIGHETTI P G ET AL, "Protein purification in multicompartment electrolyzers with isoelectric membranes", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19971010), vol. 699, no. 1-2, ISSN 1570-0232, pages 105 - 115, XP004094992 [A] * page 107 - page 110; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(97)00156-4 | [A] - RIGHETTI P G ET AL, "PREPARATIVE PROTEIN PURIFICATION IN A MULTI-COMPARTMENT ELECTROLYSER WITH IMMOBILINE MEMBRANES", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890728), vol. 475, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 293 - 309, XP000653568 [A] * page 295, paragraph 2 * * page 296, paragraph 2 - page 298 * * page 303, paragraph 2 * * page 306, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)89684-9 | International search | [A]US4396477 ; | [A]US4971670 ; | [A]US5336387 |