EP1241566 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD OF THE CABLE NETWORK DEFINED BY A SOFTWARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Change - priority | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cathay Roxus Information Technology., Co., Ltd. Union Plaza, 16 Floor, 20 Chao Wai Da Jie Chaoyang District Beijing 100020 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Cathay Roxus Information Technology., Co., Ltd. Union Plaza, 16 Floor, 20 Chao Wai Da Jie Chaoyang District, Beijing 100020 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Du, Julong 9/F Eagle Run Plaza No.26 Xiao Yun Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100016 / CN | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Patentanwälte Feldmann & Partner AG Kanalstrasse 17 8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 00979366.2 | 28.11.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000CN00524 | Priority number, date | CN20001005788 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: CN 00105788 | [2011/09] |
Former [2002/38] | CNX105788 | 07.04.2000 | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0177813 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241566 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/00, H04L12/28 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
G06F9/445 (EP);
G06F8/65 (EP);
H04L67/34 (EP);
H04N21/26291 (EP);
H04N21/42676 (EP);
H04N21/4586 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN EINES KABELNETZWERKS, DEFINIERT DURCH EIN PROGRAMM | [2002/38] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD OF THE CABLE NETWORK DEFINED BY A SOFTWARE | [2002/38] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RESEAU CABLE FAISANT APPEL A UN LOGICIEL | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2001 | Translation filed | 19.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 01.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5822603 (HANSEN CRAIG C [US], et al); | [A]US5867400 (EL-GHOROURY HUSSEIN [US], et al) |