EP1227979 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLOSING A PACKING TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson GmbH Kaiserswerther Strasse 270 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON GmbH Kaiserswerther Strasse 270 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUZOT, Herve Apartment 9G 999 Hidden Lake Drive New Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | 02 /
SCHOELLING, Hans, Werner Dohlenweg 11 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00979552.7 | 10.11.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000EP11163 | Priority number, date | DE1999156697 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19956697 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0136272 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227979 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227979 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
B65B51/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/33] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINER VERPACKUNGSHÜLSE | [2002/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLOSING A PACKING TUBE | [2002/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FERMER UN TUBE D'EMBALLAGE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 24.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4351692 (OUELLETTE JOSEPH F) [A] 1,13 * column A; figures 3,5,6 *; | [AD]US4583964 (WARNCKE NIELS [DE]) [AD] 1,13* column A; figures 1-10 * | by applicant | DE1955600 | US4583964 |