EP1236375 - FLAT LOUDSPEAKER SYSTEM FOR BASS REPRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Audio Electronic Systems GmbH Schlesische Strasse 135 94315 Straubing / DE | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Wolfgang Kästnerstrasse 10 41516 Grevenbroich / DE | 02 /
KRUMP, Gerhard Rosengasse 18 94374 Schwarzach / DE | 03 /
REGL, Hans-Jürgen Leichtlgasse 8 93049 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
ZIGANKI, Andreas Leyer Strasse 20 40822 Mettmann / DE | [2002/38] |
Former [2002/36] | 01 /
BACHMANN, Wolfgang Kästnerstrasse 10 41516 Grevenbroich / DE | ||
02 /
KRUMP, Gerhard Rosengasse 18 94374 Schwarzach / DE | |||
03 /
REGL, Hans-Jürgen Nordstrasse 88 40477 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04 /
ZIGANKI, Andreas Leyer Strasse 20 40822 Mettmann / DE | Representative(s) | Schmuckermaier, Bernhard Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Schmuckermaier, Bernhard Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/36] | Schmuckermaier, Bernhard Westphal & Partner Mozartstrasse 8 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00979559.2 | 14.11.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000EP11259 | Priority number, date | DE1999155867 | 22.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19955867 | [2002/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0139541 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1236375 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236375 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/00 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
H04R1/2819 (EP);
H04R1/26 (EP);
H04R1/2842 (EP);
H04R5/02 (EP);
H04R7/045 (EP);
H04R1/2834 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FLACHLAUTSPRECHERANORDNUNG FÜR TIEFTONWIEDERGABE | [2002/36] | English: | FLAT LOUDSPEAKER SYSTEM FOR BASS REPRODUCTION | [2002/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE HAUT-PARLEURS PLATS POUR REPRODUCTION DES GRAVES | [2002/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9935883 (NCT GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-10 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 4 * * page 7, line 18 - page 11, line 11 * * figures 1-4,11-13 * [Y] 2,7,11-18; | [Y]US2713396 (TAVARES ERNEST A) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 3 - column 8, line 66 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO9709842 (VERITY GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,11-14,16 * page 42, line 9 - page 46, line 37 * * page 51, line 10 - page 52, line 11 * * page 89, line 29 - line 33; figures 2A,2B,7A,7B,65 *; | [Y]WO9952324 (NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 15,17 * page 13, line 10 - page 15, line 8; figures 4,4A,4B *; | [Y]EP0334217 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [Y] 18 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 37 *; | [A]US4514599 (YANAGISHIMA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 11-14 * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 20 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 9; figures 12,17,18 *; | [A]WO9902012 (NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 12 * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 8; figure 5 * |