EP1242306 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH-PURITY SULPHURIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSTALEK, Martin Auf der Hardt 54 A 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
BÜTTNER, Werner Im Erlich 6 64291 Darmstadt-Arheilgen / DE | 03 /
HAFNER, Rolf Finkenweg 4 63329 Egelsbach / DE | 04 /
LU, Chih-Peng No. 8 Lane 366 Chu-lin Road Lin-kou Village Taipei County / TW | 05 /
KAN, Ching-Jung 38 Lane Jun-Tou Ding-Kan Shuli Nan-Tou / TW | 06 /
SEITZ, Ekkehart Daniel-Greiner-Weg 3 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 07 /
FRIEDEL, Ernst Parkstrasse 85 64289 Darmstadt / DE | [2002/39] | Application number, filing date | 00979672.3 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000EP12327 | Priority number, date | DE1999163509 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19963509 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0147804 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242306 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242306 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/90, C01B17/69 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C01B17/69 (EP,US);
C01B17/74 (KR);
C01B17/90 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOCHREINER SCHWEFELSÄURE | [2002/39] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH-PURITY SULPHURIC ACID | [2002/39] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDE SULFURIQUE DE GRANDE PURETE | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 04.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.04.2003 | TR | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | SE | 23.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | CY | 07.12.2003 | LU | 07.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/23] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 07.12.2003 | ||
LU | 07.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 07.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 07.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GR | 23.07.2003 | |
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 23.07.2003 | |
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | PT | 23.07.2003 | |
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3760061 (HAMMOND M); | [A]EP0150282 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | CS259353 [ ] (GASPIERIK IVAN [CS], et al); | [A]US5711928 (MORISAKI AKIRA [JP]); | [A] - GASPIERIK, IVAN ET AL, "Manufacture of sulfuric acid useful in microelectronics", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 111:80844 CA, URL: STN, XP002163475 [A] 1-11 * abstract * |