EP1248302 - HORIZONTAL JUNCTION FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2012/39] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Shin Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-8511 / JP | 02 /
HIROTSU, Kenichi Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-8511 / JP | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/39] | 01 /
HARADA, Shin, Osaka Works of Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
HIROTSU, Kenichi, Osaka Works of Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-8511 / JP | |||
Former [2002/41] | 01 /
HARADA, Shin, Osaka Works of Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
HIROTSU, Kenichi, Osaka Works of Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00979959.4 | 06.12.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000JP08645 | Priority number, date | JP19990362384 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36238499 | JP19990362385 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36238599 | JP19990362386 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36238699 | JP20000129880 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000129880 | JP20000165701 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000165701 | JP20000194464 | 28.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000194464 | JP20000286520 | 21.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000286520 | [2002/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0147029 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1248302 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1248302 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/80, H01L21/338 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
H01L29/7722 (EP,US);
H01L21/18 (KR);
H01L29/808 (EP,US);
H01L29/8083 (EP,US);
H01L29/1608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOR MIT HORIZONTALEM ÜBERGANG | [2002/41] | English: | HORIZONTAL JUNCTION FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR | [2002/41] | French: | TRANSISTOR A EFFET DE CHAMP ET A JONCTION HORIZONTALE | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2002 | Translation filed | 26.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2011 | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12185971.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 25.09.2012 | EP12185972.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 25.09.2012 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | [2013/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5264713 (PALMOUR JOHN W [US]) [DY] 4 * the whole document *; | [XY] - DMITRIEV V A ET AL, "High-temperature SiC-6H field-effect transistor with p-n gate", SOVIET TECHNICAL PHYSICS LETTERS USA, (198802), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 0360-120X, pages 127 - 128, XP008078458 [X] 1,3,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5 | [Y] - DMITRIEV V A ET AL, "NORMALLY CLOSED SIC (6H) FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR WITH A P-N GATE", SOVIET TECHNICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19910201), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 115 - 116, XP000235384 [Y] 5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS6453476 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH01103878 (NEC CORP); | [Y] - MC GARRITY,J.M. ET AL, "Silicon Carbide JFET Radiation Response", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, (199212), vol. 39, no. 6, pages 1974 - 1981, XP002937497 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/23.211393 | [Y] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, (1998), vol. J81-C-II, no. 1, pages 105 - 111, XP002937498 | [Y] - DEV ALOK AND B.J. BALIGA, "High voltage (450V) 6H-SiC substrate gate JFET (SG-JFET)", SILICON CARBIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS, (1995), no. 142, pages 749 - 752, XP002937499 | [A] - C.T. GARDNER ET AL, "Dynamic charge storage in 6H sillicon carbide", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (199209), vol. 61, no. 10, pages 1185 - 1186, XP002937500 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.107641 | by applicant | US5264713 | - DMITRIEV V A ET AL., "High-temperature SiC-6H field-effect transistor with p-n gate", SOVIET TECHNICAL PHYSICS LETTERS USA, (198802), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 127 - 128 | - "NORMALLY CLOSED SiC (6H) FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR WITH A P-N GATE", DMITRIEV V A ET AL., SOVIET TECHNICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, (19910201), vol. 17, pages 115 - 116 |