EP1164560 - LUMINOUS DISPLAY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SEIKI CO., LTD. 2-34, Higashi-Zaoh 2-chome Nagaoka-shi Niigata 940-8580 / JP | [2008/30] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states NIPPON SEIKI CO., LTD. 2-34, Higashi-Zaoh 2-chome Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-8580 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKAI, Hitoshi, R&D Center, Nippon Seiki Co., Ltd 190-1, Fujihashi 1-chome Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-2141 / JP | 02 /
MARUYAMA, Jun-ichi, R&D Ctr, Nippon Seiki Co., Ltd 190-1, Fujihashi 1-chome Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-2141 / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2001/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00980027.7 | 08.12.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000JP08729 | Priority number, date | JP19990365771 | 24.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36577199 | [2001/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0148730 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164560 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1164560 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
G09G3/14 (EP,US);
G09G3/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | LEUCHTANZEIGEEINHEIT | [2001/51] | English: | LUMINOUS DISPLAY UNIT | [2001/51] | French: | UNITE D'AFFICHAGE LUMINEUSE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2001 | Translation filed | 16.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 05.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS6380596U ; | [Y]US4658186 (HORINOUCHI ATSUSHI [JP]); | [Y]JPH10293553 (TATSUNO CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11305722 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH1187053 (TDK CORP); | [A]JPH11288243 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH10319910 (TDK CORP) |