EP1170384 - A method of operating a rotary hearth reducing furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/02] | FACILITIES FOR REDUCING METAL OXIDE, METHOD FOR OPERATING THE FACILITIES AND MOLDINGS AS LAW MATERIAL TO BE CHARGED TO REDUCTION FURNACE | ||
[2009/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IBARAKI, Tetsuharu Nippon Steel Corp. Kimitsu Works., 1, Kimutsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | 02 /
HIROMATSU, Takashi Nippon Steel Corp. Kimitsu Works., 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | 03 /
KONDO, Satoshi Nippon Steel Corp. Kimitsu Works., 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | 04 /
IMURA, Shoji Nippon Steel Corp. Kimitsu Works., 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | 05 /
ABE, Yoichi Nippon Steel Corp. Techn. Dev., 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00980059.0 | 12.12.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000JP08771 | Priority number, date | JP19990353434 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35343499 | JP19990357012 | 16.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35701299 | JP20000372016 | 06.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000372016 | JP20000372019 | 06.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000372019 | [2002/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142516 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1170384 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1170384 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C21B13/10 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
C21B13/105 (EP,US);
C21B13/10 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2002/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Drehherd-Reduktionsofens | [2010/07] | English: | A method of operating a rotary hearth reducing furnace | [2010/07] | French: | Procédé de mise en oeuvre d'un four de réduction a foyer rotatif | [2010/07] |
Former [2002/02] | EINRICHTUNGEN ZUM REDUZIEREN VON METALLOXIDEN, VERFAHREN ZUR BEDIENUNG DER EINRICHTUNGEN UND FORMTEILE ALS ROHMATERIAL, WOMIT DER REDUKTIONSOFEN CHARGIERT WIRD | ||
Former [2002/02] | FACILITIES FOR REDUCING METAL OXIDE, METHOD FOR OPERATING THE FACILITIES AND MOLDINGS AS LAW MATERIAL TO BE CHARGED TO REDUCTION FURNACE | ||
Former [2002/02] | INSTALLATIONS DE REDUCTION D'OXYDE DE METAL, PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION DE CES INSTALLATIONS ET PIECES MOULEES UTILISEES COMME MATERIAU BRUT A CHARGER DANS UN FOUR DE REDUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2001 | Translation filed | 05.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1112621 ; | [X]US2793109 (JACK HUEBLER, et al) [X] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X]DE1508051 (MIDLAND ROSS CORP) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11012621 A 19990119 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1-25 * abstract * | [X] - IM AUFTRAG DER KOMMISSION DER EUROPÄISCHEN GEMEINSCHAFTEN, Direktreduktion von Eisenerz, DÜSSELDORF, GERMANY, VERLAG STAHLEISEN M.B.H., (1976), XP002271534 [X] 1-25 * page 538 - page 547; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPS4312496B ; | [Y]JPS5245518 (HIDAKA CHIKARA); | [Y]JPS5939095U ; | [Y]JPH06206097 (TOFUKU KK); | [Y]JPH0919607 (KUBOTA KK); | [Y]JPH1112619 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) |