EP1226176 - PRODUCTION OF MAMMARY SECRETION ANTIBODIES IN FARM ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MucoVax Holding B.V Niels Bohrweg 11-13 2333 CA Leiden / NL | [2003/46] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states MucoVax B.V. Einsteinweg 55 NL-2333 CL Leiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang, He Fien de la Marstraat 26 NL-2331 HN Leiden / NL | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/31] | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00980089.7 | 31.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000NL00783 | Priority number, date | US19990162752P | 01.11.1999 Original published format: US 162752 P | EP20000202709 | 27.07.2000 Original published format: EP 00202709 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0132713 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226176 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226176 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/04, A61K39/395, A23C9/20, A61P31/04, A61K39/02, // A61K39:40 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
C07K16/04 (EP,KR);
A61K39/08 (EP);
A61P15/14 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61K2039/54 (EP);
A61K2039/543 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON ANTIKÖRPERN IN MAMMARSEKRETEN VON ZUCHTTIEREN | [2002/31] | English: | PRODUCTION OF MAMMARY SECRETION ANTIBODIES IN FARM ANIMALS | [2002/31] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ANTICORPS DE SECRETION MAMMAIRE CHEZ DES ANIMAUX D'ELEVAGE | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 25.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 08.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0892108 ; | [X]EP0074240 (GAFFIN STEPHEN LESLIE) [X] 16-18 * abstract * * page 2, lines 10-15 ** page 5, lines 11-25; examples 1,2; claim 9 *; | [X]US4944942 (BROWN KAREN K [US], et al) [X] 14 * abstract * * column 5, lines 49-56 *; | [XY]WO9702835 (ORAVAX INC [US]) [X] 14 * page 1, line 20 - page 4, line 12 * * page 15, line 14 - page 16, line 12; table 1 * * claims 1-15 * [Y] 2,3,7,11-13,15; | [XY] - SAIF L J ET AL, "IMMUNE RESPONSE OF PREGNANT COWS TO BOVINE ROTAVIRUS IMMUNIZATION", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0002-9645, pages 49 - 58, XP000961120 [X] 1,4-6,8-10,16-18 * page 50, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figure 2; table 2 * * page 52, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 52, paragraph 1 * * page 55, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 57, column 1, paragraphs 2-4 * [Y] 2,3,7,11-13,15 | [Y] - IJAZ M K ET AL, "EFFECT OF DIFFERENT ROUTES OF IMMUNIZATION WITH BOVINE ROTAVIRUS ON LACTOGENIC ANTIBODY RESPONSE IN MICE", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 8, no. 5-6, ISSN 0166-3542, pages 283 - 298, XP000961165 [Y] 2,3,7,11 * page 283, line 1 - page 284, line 3; tables 2,3 * * page 290, paragraph L - page 293, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-3542(87)80006-2 | [Y] - GARDNER D L, "INTRA MAMMARY VACCINATION AND HYPER IMMUNIZED COLOSTRUM AS A PREVENTION FOR SCOURS CAUSED BY AN ANTIBIOTIC RESISTANT ESCHERICHIA-COLI", BOVINE PRACTITIONER, vol. 11. 1976, no. RECD 1977, ISSN 0524-1685, pages 76 - 77, XP000961150 [Y] 2,3,7,11 * the whole document * | [XY] - SAIF L J ET AL, "IMMUNO GLOBULIN CLASSES OF ANTIBODIES IN MILK OF SWINE AFTER INTRA NASAL EXPOSURE TO PSEUDORABIES VIRUS OR TRANSMISSIBLE GASTROENTERITIS VIRUS", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1977), Database accession no. PREV197764056921, XP002154267 [X] 16-18 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,7,11 | [ ] - INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1977), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 961 - 966 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08092108 A 19960409 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 16-18 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,7,11 | [X] - OGURA H ET AL, "ALLERGOLOGICAL STUDY OF BREAST FEEDING OVALBUMIN AND SPECIFIC IGG IGM AND IGA ANTIBODIES TO OVALBUMIN IN HUMAN MILK", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1989), Database accession no. PREV198988062550, XP002157579 [X] 16-18 * abstract * | [ ] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF ALLERGOLOGY, (1989), vol. 38, no. 4, ISSN 0021-4884, pages 342 - 351 | Examination | WO9854226 | - Young et al: 'Production of recombinant antibodies in the milk of transgenic animals', 1998, Research in Immunology, Vol. 149, nr. 6, pp. 609-610 |