EP1229805 - Beverage products comprising a preservative system consisting of an isothiocyanate in combination with a sorbate and/or a benzoate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/33] | PRODUCTS COMPRISING AN ISOTHIOCYANATE PRESERVATIVE SYSTEM AND METHODS OF THEIR USE | ||
[2003/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EKANAYAKE, Athula 8656 Birchbark Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | 02 /
BUNGER, John, Robert 4814 Setters Road Union, KY 41091 / US | 03 /
BUNKE, Paul, Ralph 4574 Nathaniel Glen Drive Cincinnati, OH 45248 / US | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Kremer, Véronique, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 00980671.2 | 20.11.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000US32078 | Priority number, date | US19990442558 | 18.11.1999 Original published format: US 442558 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0135769 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229805 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1229805 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/3472, A23L3/3526, A23L3/3535, A23L3/3508, A23B7/154 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
A23L3/3526 (EP,US);
A23B7/154 (EP,US);
A23L3/3472 (EP,US);
A23L3/3508 (EP,US);
A23L3/3535 (EP,US);
Y02A40/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Getränkeprodukte enthaltend ein Konservierungssystem bestehend aus einem Isothiocyanat in Kombination mit einem Sorbat und/oder einem Benzoat | [2003/38] | English: | Beverage products comprising a preservative system consisting of an isothiocyanate in combination with a sorbate and/or a benzoate | [2003/38] | French: | Boissons pourvues d'un système de conservation contenant un isothiocyanate en combinaison avec un sorbate et/ou un benzoate | [2003/38] |
Former [2002/33] | PRODUKTE ENTHALTEND ISOTHIOCYANAT KONSERVIERUNGSSYSTEM UND ANWENDUNGSMETHODE | ||
Former [2002/33] | PRODUCTS COMPRISING AN ISOTHIOCYANATE PRESERVATIVE SYSTEM AND METHODS OF THEIR USE | ||
Former [2002/33] | PRODUITS POURVUS D'UN SYSTEME DE CONSERVATION CONTENANT DE L'ISOTHIOCYANATE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 25.02.2004 | CY | 25.02.2004 | FI | 25.02.2004 | IT | 25.02.2004 | LI | 25.02.2004 | TR | 25.02.2004 | DK | 25.05.2004 | SE | 25.05.2004 | PT | 25.07.2004 | LU | 20.11.2004 | IE | 22.11.2004 | [2018/36] |
Former [2018/28] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
CY | 25.02.2004 | ||
ES | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
IT | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
PT | 25.07.2004 | ||
LU | 20.11.2004 | ||
IE | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2008/03] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
CY | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
IT | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
PT | 25.07.2004 | ||
LU | 20.11.2004 | ||
IE | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/35] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
CY | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
IT | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
LU | 20.11.2004 | ||
IE | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
CY | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
LU | 20.11.2004 | ||
IE | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
IE | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
IE | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
SE | 25.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB568009 (HARRY HURST, et al) [X] 1,9,10 * page 6, line 25 - line 34; claim - * * page 7, line 53 - line 79 * * page 6, line 51 - line 55 *; | [X]GB568011 (STAFFORD ALLEN AND SONS LTD, et al) [X] 1,9,10 * page 1, line 43 - line 58; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US3725030 (NEWALLIS P, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 26 - line 54 *; | [A]US3844761 (NEWALLIS P, et al); | [X]GB1473037 (LIOT SA) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10 * page 2, line 4 - line 11; claims 1,5,9 * * page 2, line 24 - line 35; example - *; | [A]US4756919 (CIRIGIANO MICHAEL C [US], et al); | [A]US4948617 (DARTEY CLEMENCE K [US], et al); | [X]EP0452273 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1,3-8,10,11 * example -; claims 1,2,7,9,11 *; | [X]EP0867125 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 32 - line 34; examples 1,2; claims 1,3,4 * * page 3, line 53 - line 58 * * page 3, line 36 - line 37 *; | [X]WO9850005 (MEDLOGIC GLOBAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5968567 (FAHEY JED W [US], et al) [X] 2,3,7,8 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5985303 (OKADA TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * column 2, line 33 - line 41 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 8; table - *; | [PA]WO0054838 (NYCOMED PHARMA AS [NO], et al) |