EP1252624 - OPTICAL STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HSM Holographic Systems München GmbH Melchior-Huber-Strasse 25 85652 Ottersberg / DE | [2002/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUSMANN, Günther Zur Niedermühle 11 85435 Erding / DE | 02 /
MENZ, Irina Wartheweg 12 86420 Diedorf / DE | 03 /
YANG, Zishao Schmiedstrasse 15 85435 Erding / DE | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Lettau, Christoph Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Lettau, Christoph, Dr. Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00981376.7 | 14.12.2000 | [2002/44] | WO2000EP12747 | Priority number, date | DE2000104870 | 04.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10004870 | [2002/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0157863 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1252624 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B23/40 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
G11B23/281 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00876 (EP,US);
G11B23/40 (EP,US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
G03H2270/22 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2002/44] | English: | OPTICAL STORAGE MEDIUM | [2002/44] | French: | SUPPORT MEMOIRE OPTIQUE | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/08] | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5946286 (BAHNS TED L [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2290526 (TAYLOR DAVID JOHN [GB]) [X] 1 * figure 2; claims 1,8 *; | [X]JPH10214439 ; | [X]EP0933760 (WEA MFG INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 2; claims 1,6 *; | [X]WO9741557 (GPT AXXICON BV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 25; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9926241 (SONO PRESS PRODUKTIONSGESELLSC [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2; claims 1,13 *; | [X]US5766495 (PARETTE JOHN JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1,17 *; | [DA]WO9913466 (WEA MFG INC [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2326843 (STRACHAN GEOFFREY [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10214439 A 19980811 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |