EP1242317 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING WATER BY OXYGENATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVALIER, Gilbert 2, place Derain F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
FAVIER, Pascal 31, rue des Ardennes F-75019 Paris / FR | 03 /
DURTSCHI, Franck, Stéphane 22, avenue de la Gare batiment B F-91570 bievres / FR | 04 /
FERRAND, Frédérique 42bis, rue Henri de Régnier F-78000 Versailles / FR | [2002/43] |
Former [2002/39] | 01 /
CHEVALIER, Gilbert 2, place Derain F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | ||
02 /
FAVIER, Pascal 31, rue des Ardennes F-75019 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
DURTSCHI, Franck, Stéphane 64, rue Rieussec F-78220 Viroflay / FR | |||
04 /
FERRAND, Frédérique 42bis, rue Henri de Régnier F-78000 Versailles / FR | Representative(s) | Ducreux, Marie, et al L'Air Liquide Service Propriété Industrielle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Ducreux, Marie, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00981442.7 | 20.11.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000FR03217 | Priority number, date | FR19990015397 | 07.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9915397 | [2002/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142146 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242317 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/00, C02F3/26 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C02F1/72 (EP);
C02F1/008 (EP);
C02F1/74 (EP);
C02F3/02 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WASSERBEHANDLUNG DURCH SAUERSTOFFANREICHERUNG | [2002/39] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING WATER BY OXYGENATION | [2002/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE EAU PAR OXYGENATION | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/17] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0486199 (COMMW IND GASES [AU]) [A] 1-5,7-10,12,13 * page 4, lines 8-14; figure 4; claim -; table 1 *; | [A]US3857757 (HERRICK C, et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [A]EP0292374 (DEGREMONT [FR]) [A] 1,17 * claim - *; | [A]FR2779140 (SUEZ LYONNAISE DES EAUX [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |