EP1255286 - MONITOR, METHOD OF MONITORING, POLISHING DEVICE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIYAMA, Yoshikazu, Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-1005 / JP | 02 /
OHUCHI, Yasushi, Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-1005 / JP | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/45] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00981828.7 | 19.12.2000 | [2002/45] | WO2000JP08992 | Priority number, date | JP20000015365 | 25.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000015365 | JP20000354603 | 21.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000354603 | [2002/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0156068 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255286 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, B24B37/04, B24B49/12, B24D7/12 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B24B37/013 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
B24B49/04 (EP,US);
B24B49/12 (EP,US);
B24D7/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | H01L21/304, B24B37/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MONITOR, ÜBERWACHUNGSMETHODE, POLIERMASCHINE, UND HERSTELLUNGSMETHODE FÜR EINE HALBLEITERSCHEIBE | [2002/45] | English: | MONITOR, METHOD OF MONITORING, POLISHING DEVICE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER | [2002/45] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTROLE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE, DISPOSITIF DE POLISSAGE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE TRANCHE DE SILICIUM | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2002 | Translation filed | 23.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0663265 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,4,6,12 * figures 3,8 * * column 6, line 7 - line 22 * * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 16 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 25 * * column 13, line 3 - line 7 *; | [A]JPH1133901 (NIKON CORP) [A] 2,7,8,11 * the whole document *; | [PX]US6146242 (TREUR RANDOLPH E [US], et al) [PX] 1,4 * figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, line 30 - line 32 * | International search | [A]JPH11151663 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH0286128U ; | [A]EP0882550 (EBARA CORP [JP]); | [AE]JP2001009699 (NICHIDEN MACH LTD, et al) |