EP1156600 - CDMA TERMINAL AND CDMA METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Masatoshi 1-20-10-205, Saido Konan-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 233-000 / JP | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00981832.9 | 19.12.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000JP09001 | Priority number, date | JP19990366309 | 24.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36630999 | [2001/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0148951 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1156600 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
H04W52/267 (EP,US);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04W52/04 (KR);
H04W52/228 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
H04W52/325 (EP,US);
H04W52/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CDMA EMPFÄNGER UND CDMA VERFAHREN | [2001/47] | English: | CDMA TERMINAL AND CDMA METHOD | [2001/47] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCEDE AMCR | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2001 | Translation filed | 13.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 28.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0613956 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH08130535 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH08149567 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH10145245 (Y R P IDO TSUSHIN KIBAN GIJUTS) |