EP1285122 - APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING SHRINKAGE OF A FIBER WEB DURING A DRYING PROCESS, ASSOCIATED METHOD, AND FIBER WEB PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper Karlstad Aktiebolag Box 1014 651 15 Karlstad / SE | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHLSTRÖM, Torbjörn Mariebergsvägen 10 S-652 29 Karlstad / SE | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 00982015.0 | 24.11.2000 | [2003/09] | WO2000SE02334 | Priority number, date | SE19990004332 | 26.11.1999 Original published format: SE 9904332 | US19990172470P | 17.12.1999 Original published format: US 172470 P | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138634 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285122 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/00 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
D21F5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI [2004/20] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG DES SCHRUMPFENS EINER PAPIERBAHN BEIM TROCKENVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERESTELLTE FASERBAHN | [2003/09] | English: | APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING SHRINKAGE OF A FIBER WEB DURING A DRYING PROCESS, ASSOCIATED METHOD, AND FIBER WEB PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THE METHOD | [2003/09] | French: | APPAREIL POUR REGULER LE RETRECISSEMENT D'UNE BANDE DE FIBRES LORS DU SECHAGE, PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT ET BANDE DE FIBRES PRODUITE SELON CE PROCEDE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 01.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4680873 ; | [A]DE1111811 |