EP1233730 - INTRAOCULAR LENS IMPLANTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Medical Optics Uppsala AB Box 6406 751 36 Uppsala / SE | [2006/29] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Pfizer Health AB 112 87 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Pharmacia AB 112 87 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HJERTMAN, Birger Svärdsliljevägen 186 S-162 43 Vällingby / SE | 02 /
FRIDHOLM, Jonas Tunnlandsvägen 46 S-168 36 Bromma / SE | 03 /
HIMBERT, Hans Tacitusvägen 28 S-161 53 Bromma / SE | 04 /
CRAFOORD, Carl-Göran Kevinge Strand 21 A S-182 57 Danderyd / SE | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Holmberg, Martin Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/35] | Elwe, Magnus, et al Pharmacia AB Patent Department 112 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00982028.3 | 29.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000SE02372 | Priority number, date | SE19990004338 | 30.11.1999 Original published format: SE 9904338 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0139701 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233730 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233730 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/1667 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2230/0013 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | 10.05.2002 | LT | 10.05.2002 | LV | 10.05.2002 | MK | 10.05.2002 | RO | 10.05.2002 | SI | 10.05.2002 | Title | German: | IMPLANTATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR INTRAOKULARLINSEN | [2002/35] | English: | INTRAOCULAR LENS IMPLANTER | [2002/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPLANTATION DE LENTILLES INTRAOCULAIRES | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.04.2009 | BE | 29.04.2009 | CY | 29.04.2009 | DK | 29.04.2009 | FI | 29.04.2009 | IT | 29.04.2009 | TR | 29.04.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.07.2009 | ES | 09.08.2009 | PT | 29.08.2009 | IE | 29.11.2009 | LU | 29.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
IE | 29.11.2009 | ||
LU | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
IE | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
IE | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 09.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0270257 (COOPER CO INC [US], et al); | [A]US4834094 (PATTON DOUGLAS M [US], et al); | [A]US5190552 (KELMAN CHARLES D [US]); | [X]WO9715253 (STAAR SURGICAL CO INC [US]); | [X]US5728102 (FEINGOLD VLADIMIR [US], et al); | [X]WO9837830 (STAAR SURGICAL CO INC [US]) |